This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2020 at 08:04:48 (UTC).

Nieves, Jr. v. Rodriguez Beato

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Nieves, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rodriguez Beato. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent L. Briccetti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-01606

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vincent L. Briccetti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Nieves, Jr.

Defendants

Julio A Rodriguez Beato

Cowan Systems, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven I Fried

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Adam Segal

Ian Kingsley

 

Court Documents

#10

#23

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Affidavit of Service

#12

#9

#7

#6

#5

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #20 Amended Complaint, against Cowan Systems, LLC, Julio A Rodriguez Beato.Document filed by David Nieves, Jr.. Related document: #20 Amended Complaint,..(Fried, Steven) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: Plaintiff's time to file an amended complaint is extended to 4/30/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #19 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Steven I. Fried, Esq. dated April 16, 2020. Document filed by David Nieves, Jr...(Fried, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven I Fried to RE-FILE re: Document No. #20 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Court's leave has not been granted. The amended complaint was filed incorrectly on the due date. Permission from Chambers will be needed to refile the Amended Complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (pc) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #19 Amended Complaint, against Cowan Systems, LLC.Document filed by David Nieves, Jr.. Related document: #19 Amended Complaint,..(Fried, Steven) Modified on 4/16/2020 (pc). (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven I Fried to RE-FILE re: Document No. #19 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Cowan Systems, LLC as a new party; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected; if pleading deficiency is cured and refiled after 4/15/2020, Court's leave must be granted. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #18 Amended Complaint, against Cowan Equipment Leasing, LLC.Document filed by David Nieves, Jr.. Related document: #18 Amended Complaint,..(Fried, Steven) Modified on 4/15/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven I Fried to RE-FILE re: Document No. #18 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; COWAN SYSTEMS, LLC MUST BE ADDED TO THE CASE; THE ALL DEFENDANTS RADIO BUTTON WAS SELECTED; THE PARTY/PARTIES WHOM THE PLEADING IS AGAINST WERE NOT SELECTED. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. DO NOT SELECT THE ALL PARTIES, ALL PLAINTIFFS, OR ALL DEFENDANTS RADIO BUTTONS. (pne) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR- AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #17 Amended Complaint against All Defendants.Document filed by David Nieves, Jr.. Related document: #17 Amended Complaint..(Fried, Steven) Modified on 4/14/2020 (pne). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven I Fried to RE-FILE re: Document No. #17 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the first page of the PDF is not part of the pleading and must be removed; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Cowan Systems, LLC must be added to the case; the All Defendant radio button was selected; the party/parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the corrected PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference April 2, 2020 or April 6, 2020 addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from The Law Steven I. Fried, PC dated March 11, 2020. Document filed by David Nieves, Jr...(Fried, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by David Nieves, Jr..(Fried, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven I Fried on behalf of David Nieves, Jr...(Fried, Steven) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 4-1-20 at 2:30 p.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 620, White Plains, NY 10601, and as further specified and set forth in this Notice of Initial Conference. Donna Hilbert, Deputy Clerk to Hon. Vincent L. Briccetti. (Initial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 620, U.S. Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti). (rjm) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cowan Equipment Leasing, LLC..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: 68742/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18899484).Document filed by Julio A Rodriguez Beato, Cowan Equipment Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Response to SOD).(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less