This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:25:38 (UTC).

NIETO v. POMPEO et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 NIETO filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against POMPEO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas F. Hogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03650

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas F. Hogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILIANNE RODRIGUEZ NIETO

Defendants

LANDON TAYLOR

CARL C. RISCH

MICHAEL R. POMPEO

EDWARD J. RAMOTOWSKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul R. Monsees

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER

3000 K Street, Nw, 3000 K Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20007-5109

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/16/2019. (Monsees, Paul) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #8 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with correct signature page and correct date served. (jf) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2020. (Monsees, Paul) Modified on 1/8/2020 (jf). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #3 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct event for service upon U.S Attorney for DC. (jf) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 12/23/2019 (Monsees, Paul) Modified on 1/8/2020 to correct party served (jf). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Monsees, Paul) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Monsees, Paul) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CARL C. RISCH served on 12/18/2019 (Monsees, Paul) Modified on 1/8/2020 to correct party served (jf). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/17/2019. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 1/7/2020. (Monsees, Paul) Modified on 1/6/2020 (jf). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL R. POMPEO, EDWARD J. RAMOTOWSKI, CARL C. RISCH, LANDON TAYLOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6627076) filed by LILIANNE RODRIGUEZ NIETO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Michael Pompeo, #3 Summons to Carl Risch, #4 Summons to Edward Ramotowski, #5 Summons to Landon Taylor, #6 Summons Jessie Liu, #7 Summons William Barr, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Monsees, Paul) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less