This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:37:06 (UTC).

Martha Niedbal v. Velocity Investments, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Martha Niedbal filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Velocity Investments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martha Niedbal

Defendants

Velocity Investments, LLC

FarMar Law Group, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott M Grace

Attorney at Grace Law APC

1958 Sunset Cliffs Boulevard

San Diego, CA 92107

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25066322 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal. (Attorney Scott M Grace added to party Martha Niedbal(pty:pla))(Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than February 25, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Proof of service of summons and complaint (applicable for defendant(s) who have not been served); In cases removed from State Court, responsive pleadings filed by all defendants; Request for entry of default by plaintiff(s) (applicable where defendants have been served but not answered); Motion for default judgment.No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. (lom) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit 3

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal. (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal, (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal, upon Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jannette Hurley, person authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Grace, Scott) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal. (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #4

Exhibit 4

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants FarMar Law Group, P.C., Velocity Investments, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiff has failed to request entry of default as to Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted with regard to this defendant. Plaintiff's response does not indicate that any action has been taken with regard to Defendant Velocity's default. The case is dismissed as to Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC., with a copy of this order. Velocity Investments, LLC terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiff has failed to request entry of default as to Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted with regard to this defendant. Plaintiff's response does not indicate that any action has been taken with regard to Defendant Velocity's default. The case is dismissed as to Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC., with a copy of this order. Velocity Investments, LLC terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Grace, Scott) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than February 25, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Proof of service of summons and complaint (applicable for defendant(s) who have not been served); In cases removed from State Court, responsive pleadings filed by all defendants; Request for entry of default by plaintiff(s) (applicable where defendants have been served but not answered); Motion for default judgment.No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. (lom) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal, upon Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jannette Hurley, person authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants FarMar Law Group, P.C., Velocity Investments, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal. (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal, (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal. (Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25066322 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Martha Niedbal. (Attorney Scott M Grace added to party Martha Niedbal(pty:pla))(Grace, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less