This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 09:02:58 (UTC).

NIDES v. NURTURE, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 NIDES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NURTURE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01118

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIM NIDES

Defendant

NURTURE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas C. Willcox

Attorney at THOMAS C. WILLCOX, ATTORNEY AT LAW

1701 16Th Street, Suite 211

Washington, DC 20009

Defendant Attorney

Mary Elizabeth Gately

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

500 Eighth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NURTURE, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-01217; 1:21-cv-01271-MSK; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 1:21-cv-01534-MKV; 1:21-cv-01882-MKV; 1:21-cv-02101-MKV; 1:21-CV-02129-MKV; 1:21-CV-02553-MKV; 1:21-CV-03159MKV; 1:21-CV-03499-MKV; 1:21-CV-04997-MKV; 1:21-CV-05344-MKV; 1:21-CV-05748-MKV; 1:21-CV-06678-MKV; 1:21-CV-06861-MKV; 1:21-CV-06918-MKV; 1:21-CV-07283-MKV; 1:21-CV-08030-MKV. (Gately, Mary) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NURTURE, INC. (Gately, Mary) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- COLLEEN CAREY GULLIVER, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9212166. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NURTURE, INC.. (Gately, Mary) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Receipt on 5/11/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 001149 B. (znmw) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Colleen Carey Gulliver. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/18/2022. (lcac) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Receipt on 5/11/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 001149 B. (znmw) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- COLLEEN CAREY GULLIVER, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9212166. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NURTURE, INC.. (Gately, Mary) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmh) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NURTURE, INC. (Gately, Mary) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NURTURE, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-01217; 1:21-cv-01271-MSK; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 1:21-cv-01534-MKV; 1:21-cv-01882-MKV; 1:21-cv-02101-MKV; 1:21-CV-02129-MKV; 1:21-CV-02553-MKV; 1:21-CV-03159MKV; 1:21-CV-03499-MKV; 1:21-CV-04997-MKV; 1:21-CV-05344-MKV; 1:21-CV-05748-MKV; 1:21-CV-06678-MKV; 1:21-CV-06861-MKV; 1:21-CV-06918-MKV; 1:21-CV-07283-MKV; 1:21-CV-08030-MKV. (Gately, Mary) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District of Columbia Superior Court, case number 2022 CA 001149 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9190587 filed by NURTURE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gately, Mary) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nurture, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Elizabeth Gately