This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:47:34

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by Nicolas against Experian Information Solutions, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03343
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Finance - Consumer Credit
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Robert W. Gettleman
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC
  • Represented By
    • Tameika L. Montgomery
    • Misty L. Peterson
    • Rodney L. Lewis
  • Defendant Comenity Bank
  • Represented By
    • Jennifer Lisa Majewski
    • Anna-Katrina S Christakis
  • Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Craig Sanders
  • Plaintiff Susan A. Nicolas
  • Represented By
    • Tara Leigh Goodwin
    • Daniel A. Edelman
    • Cathleen M. Combs

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information ...

Fees Apply
#29

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:...

Fees Apply
#28

(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 1...

Fees Apply
#27

(#27) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Di...

Fees Apply
26 #1

Status Report Form

Fees Apply
#26

(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:...

Fees Apply
#25

(#25) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 ...

Fees Apply
#24

(#24) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses to P...

Fees Apply
#23

(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information ...

Fees Apply
#22

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:...

Fees Apply
#20

(#20) MOTION by Defendant Comenity Bank for extension of tim...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • (#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Misty L. Peterson (Peterson, Misty) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Angela M. Taylor's motion to appear pro hac vice #28 is granted. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/15/2019)
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16031198. (Taylor, Angela) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#27) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form and deliver a courtesy copy to chambers by 7/17/2019. Status hearing set for 7/24/2019 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Form) (cn). (Entered: 07/12/2019)
  • 07/10/2019
  • (#25) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
  • 07/10/2019
  • (#24) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC(Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Tameika L. Montgomery (Montgomery, Tameika) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Comenity Bank's agreed motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs complaint #20 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 7/17/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 06/26/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#21) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lisa Majewski for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #20 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/27/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Majewski, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#20) MOTION by Defendant Comenity Bank for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (AGREED) (Majewski, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#19) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Comenity Bank (Majewski, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Comenity Bank by Anna-Katrina S Christakis (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Comenity Bank by Jennifer Lisa Majewski (Majewski, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer plaintiff's complaint #13 is granted. Defendant Equifax's responsive pleading due 7/10/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 6/18/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan A. Nicolas as to Comenity Bank on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Goodwin, Tara) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#14) UNOPPOSED - NOTICE of Motion by Rodney L. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/18/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#13) MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer - UNOPPOSED (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Mary Kathryn Curry (Curry, Mary) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.