This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 08:09:43 (UTC).

Nickisher v. MSK Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Nickisher filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MSK Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05570

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cody Nickisher

Defendants

MSK Management, LLC d/b/a Domino's Pizza

DOMINO'S PIZZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A SHORE PC

Two Penn Center Suite 1240, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Mary Elizabeth LeMieux-Fillery

Attorney at The Law Offices of Eric A. Shore

1500 Jfk Blvd, Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 12/20/2021. (cw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/20/2021)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cody Nickisher. All Defendants served on 12/20/21 and answer due 2/18/22. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lvj). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cody Nickisher. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cody Nickisher. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cody Nickisher. All Defendants served on 12/20/21 and answer due 2/18/22. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lvj). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-02116. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 12/20/2021. (cw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Domino's Pizza, MSK Management, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5790957), filed by Cody Nickisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSK MANAGEMENT INC; DBA : MSK DEVELOPMENT GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY