This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2019 at 07:29:53 (UTC).

Nicholson v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Nicholson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bank of America, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David J. Hale and Regina S. Edwards. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kay Nicholson

Defendants

Bank of America, N.A.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Hemminger

Attorney at Hemminger Law Office, PSC

331 Townepark Circle, Suite 100-C

Louisville, KY 40243

Defendant Attorney

Brian M. Bennett

Attorney at Stites & Harbison, PLLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202-3352

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0644-2896276), filed by Kay Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (AME) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#5

(#5) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Bank of America, N.A. COMPLETED on 7/10/2019. (MEJ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.. by Bank of America, N.A.. (Bennett, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Bennett, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#8

(#8) AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/11/2019. BANA is GRANTED through and including 9/6/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (MEJ) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/11/2019. BANA is GRANTED through and including 9/6/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (MEJ) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Bennett, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.. by Bank of America, N.A.. (Bennett, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Bank of America, N.A. COMPLETED on 7/10/2019. (MEJ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/8/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (AME) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0644-2896276), filed by Kay Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.