This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 11:54:01 (UTC).

Nicholson et al v. WakeMed et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Nicholson filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against WakeMed. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00662

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexander Carlisle

Earlene N Hunter

Toby Beliveau

Takisha L Nicholson

Defendants

WakeMed

Board of Directors of WakeMed

Finance Committee of Wake Med

John Does 1-30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John R. Szymankiewicz

Attorney at Matheson Law Office PLLC

16 W. Martin Street, #501

Raleigh, NC 27601

Donald R. Reavey

Attorney at Capozzi Adler, P.C.

2933 North Front Street

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Mark K. Gyandoh

Attorney at Capozzi Adler, P.C.

2933 North Front Street

Harrisburg, PA 17110

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#13

12 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

5 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#5

4 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#4

3 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#3

2 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #11 Notice of Appearance. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerk's office issuing a notice of deficiency.Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Donald R. Reavey on behalf of Toby Beliveau, Alexander Carlisle, Earlene N Hunter, Takisha L Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mark K. Gyandoh on behalf of Toby Beliveau, Alexander Carlisle, Earlene N Hunter, Takisha L Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Szymankiewicz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSECOND Notice to Counsel - Local Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #5 Notice of Appearance, #4 Notice of Appearance. Wrong events used. Counsel shall refile using the event Notice of Special Appearance. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Earlene N Hunter (Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by Alexander Carlisle (Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Toby Beliveau (Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #12 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Mark K. Gyandoh on behalf of Toby Beliveau, Alexander Carlisle, Earlene N Hunter, Takisha L Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gyandoh, Mark) Modified on 12/16/2020 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #13 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Donald R. Reavey on behalf of Toby Beliveau, Alexander Carlisle, Earlene N Hunter, Takisha L Nicholson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Reavey, Donald) Modified on 12/16/2020 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Special Appearance, #3 Notice of Special Appearance. Special Appearance Attorneys shall comply with Local Civil Rule 83.1(e)(1). Once Special Appearance Attorneys receive their login and password from the EDNC, they shall file their Notice of Special Appearance so that they will be added to the docket to receive notices of electronic filing (NEF's). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Local Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Toby Beliveau, Alexander Carlisle, Earlene N Hunter, Takisha L Nicholson. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. Counsel should file the Summons using the event "Notice-Other". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John R. Szymankiewicz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John R. Szymankiewicz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5764507.), filed by Takisha L Nicholson, Earlene N Hunter, Alexander Carlisle, Toby Beliveau. (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WakeMed is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN R. SZYMANKIEWICZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald R. Reavey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark K. Gyandoh