This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 08:28:10 (UTC).

NICHOLS v. ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 NICHOLS filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julien Xavier Neals and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-19575

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julien Xavier Neals

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPHINE NICHOLS

Defendants

ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.

RWJBarnabas Health, Inc.

JANE DOE I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown)

JOHN DOE I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown)

XYZ CORPORATION I-V (these names being fictitious as their present identities are unknown)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY B. NOBLE

Attorney at O'CONNOR PARSONS & LANE LLC

959 South Springfield Avenue2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 07081

Defendant Attorneys

MARK J. BLUNDA

Attorney at APRUZZESE, MCDERMOTT, MASTRO & MURPHY, PC

25 Independence Boulevardpo Box 112

Liberty Corner, NJ 07938

NEHA PATEL

Attorney at APRUZZESE MCDERMOTT

25 Independence Boulevardp.O. Box 112

Liberty Corner, NJ 07938

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Supplement Notice of Removal to Superior Court

1 #2

Supplement Cover Letter for Removal

#2

(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. and Robert Wood Johnson University Hospital, Inc.. Attorney MARK J. BLUNDA for ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.,MARK J. BLUNDA for RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. added. (BLUNDA, MARK) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, NEHA) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. identifying RWJBARNABAS HEALTH, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, NEHA) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER scheduling a Telephone Conference on 1/24/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/23/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER ORDER scheduling a Telephone Conference on 1/24/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/23/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., RWJBarnabas Health, Inc..(PATEL, NEHA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/24/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. identifying RWJBARNABAS HEALTH, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, NEHA) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, NEHA) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. and Robert Wood Johnson University Hospital, Inc.. Attorney MARK J. BLUNDA for ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.,MARK J. BLUNDA for RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. added. (BLUNDA, MARK) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID L 5779 21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12949091), filed by RWJBarnabas Health, Inc., ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Removal to Superior Court, #2 Supplement Cover Letter for Removal)(PATEL, NEHA) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEHA PATEL