This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2019 at 08:16:42 (UTC).

Niblock et al v. University of Kentucky et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 a Civil Right - Education Discrimination case was filed by Niblock against University of Kentucky in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00394

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth Niblock

Meredith Newman

Defendants

Board of Trustees

Mitch Barnhart

Eli Capilouto

University of Kentucky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beatriz Mate-Kodjo

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman, P.L.C.

521 E. Locust Street, Suite 300

Des Moines, IA 50309

Lori Bullock

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman, P.L.C.

521 E. Locust Street, Suite 300

Des Moines, IA 50309

Jill Zwagerman

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman, P.L.C.

521 E. Locust Street, Suite 300

Des Moines, IA 50309

Barbara D. Bonar

Attorney at Bonar, Bucher & Rankin, PSC

3611 Decoursey Avenue

Covington, KY 41015

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elizabeth Niblock. All Defendants. (Zwagerman, Jill) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Niblock.(Zwagerman, Jill) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Beatriz Mate-Kodjo; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jill M. Zwagerman; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lori Bullock for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/27/19. (JLM)cc: COR via U.S. mail w/ecf registration forms. Modified text on 9/27/2019 (KJR). (Entered: 09/27/2019)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Lori Bullock

#6

(#6) MOTION for Lori Bullock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473865) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Lori Bullock, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonar, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Jill M. Zwagerman

#5

(#5) MOTION for Jill M. Zwagerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473851) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Jill M. Zwagerman, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonar, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Beatriz Mate-Kodjo

#4

(#4) MOTION for Beatriz Mate-Kodjo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473836) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Beatriz Mate-Kodjo, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonar, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

3 #3

Summons Eli Capilouto

3 #2

Summons Mitch Barnhart

3 #1

Summons Board of Trustees

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Mitch Barnhart, Board of Trustees, Eli Capilouto, University of Kentucky; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Board of Trustees, #2 Summons Mitch Barnhart, #3 Summons Eli Capilouto)(JJ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

1 #5

Summons Eli Capilouto

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4473467), filed by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons University of Kentucky, #3 Summons Board of Trustees, #4 Summons Mitch Barnhart, #5 Summons Eli Capilouto)(JJ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elizabeth Niblock. All Defendants. (Zwagerman, Jill) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Niblock.(Zwagerman, Jill) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Beatriz Mate-Kodjo; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jill M. Zwagerman; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lori Bullock for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/27/19. (JLM)cc: COR via U.S. mail w/ecf registration forms. Modified text on 9/27/2019 (KJR). (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #5 MOTION for Jill M. Zwagerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473851), #4 MOTION for Beatriz Mate-Kodjo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473836), #6 MOTION for Lori Bullock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473865) (KJR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BAR STATUS Check completed as to Lori Bullock, Jill Zwagerman, Beatriz Mate-Kodjo re #5 MOTION for Jill M. Zwagerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473851), #6 MOTION for Lori Bullock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473865), #4 MOTION for Beatriz Mate-Kodjo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473836). (KJR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Lori Bullock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473865) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Lori Bullock, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonar, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Jill M. Zwagerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473851) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Jill M. Zwagerman, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonar, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Beatriz Mate-Kodjo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4473836) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing - Beatriz Mate-Kodjo, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonar, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Mitch Barnhart, Board of Trustees, Eli Capilouto, University of Kentucky; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Board of Trustees, #2 Summons Mitch Barnhart, #3 Summons Eli Capilouto)(JJ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (JJ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4473467), filed by Meredith Newman, Elizabeth Niblock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons University of Kentucky, #3 Summons Board of Trustees, #4 Summons Mitch Barnhart, #5 Summons Eli Capilouto)(JJ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.