This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2021 at 07:27:30 (UTC).

Niang et al v. Paulin et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Niang filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Paulin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. Friot. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00365

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. Friot

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mery Cing Hat Niang

S.T.

Defendants

Connie Nolan

Tracy Renaud

Bruce Paulin

Alejandro Mayorkas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Breanna R Cary

Attorney at Breanna Cary, PLLC

Po Box 5691

Edmond, OK 73083

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/21/2021. (cps) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by S.T., Mery Cing Hat Niang Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 4/20/21. (dtb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Complaint served on Robert J. Troester, OKWD US Attorney on 4/30/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Mery Cing Hat Niang, S.T.. (Cary, Breanna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mery Cing Hat Niang, S.T.. Tracy Renaud served on 5/5/2021. (Cary, Breanna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mery Cing Hat Niang, S.T.. Bruce Paulin served on 5/5/2021. (Cary, Breanna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mery Cing Hat Niang, S.T.. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 5/5/2021. (Cary, Breanna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mery Cing Hat Niang, S.T.. Connie Nolan served on 5/5/2021. (Cary, Breanna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Bruce Paulin, Tracy Renaud. (dtb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/21/2021. (cps) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Breanna R Cary on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cary, Breanna) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by S.T., Mery Cing Hat Niang Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 4/20/21. (dtb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by All Plaintiffs. (dtb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.T. is a litigant