This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2021 at 07:25:21 (UTC).

NHL Enterprises, L.P. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 NHL Enterprises, L P filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02239

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NHL Enterprises, L.P.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

nhlfansjersey.sale

JIUNZ

Gsbao Xkerq

Vicky DianXun

Hai Xun

Ze Cheng Shang Mao

nhlfacecoverings.com

nhljerseyfans.com

jerseyspop.com

SiFanFang

Boyang Xingze

SportsSuperStar

Jiu Zhu

nhlfansjersey.com

Wang ShuaiChao

downtowndchotels.com

Yuanscream Fu

cftc-pca-mulhouse.com

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

39 #2

Exhibit 1

39 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#39

#38

#37

#32

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 6/24/2021:. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #38 is granted. Enter Final Judgment Order. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE by NHL Enterprises, L.P. re MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for entry of default as to all DefendantsMOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for default judgment as to all Defendants #38 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MEMORANDUM by NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: nhlfans.shop, nhlfacecoverings.com, nhlfansjersey.com, flyersteamfanstore.com, nhljerseyfans.com, nhlfanjersey.net, nhlfansjersey.sale, fabienne-eustratiades.com, buytramadolus2us.com, cftc-pca-mulhouse.com, callyourmissionary.com, downtowndchotels.com, brunopedros.com, nhlfansjersey.net, jerseyspop.com, firefishgallery.com, Aopu, Boyang Xingze, Chuang Bo, Gsbao Xkerq, Hai Xun, Hubo Xinshen, jiami-ng, jianihuy, Jiu Zhu, JIUNZ, KatherineBlan, Lanmeihejin, Li Wen Wufhfhj, Marina Arabella, Qgghfsdjfdh, SiFanFang, TYUING, Vicky DianXun, Wang ShuaiChao, Yuanscream Fu, Ze Cheng Shang Mao and SportsSuperStar added to case caption. (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 5/26/2021. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #32 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. In addition, is a link to video instructions for Plaintiff to view on how to Add Terminate Party https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Videos.aspx?folder=_cmecf&play=Add_Terminate.mp4. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NHL Enterprises, L.P. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE by NHL Enterprises, L.P. re MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for preliminary injunction #32 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (daj, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff NHL Enterprises, L.P. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by NHL Enterprises, L.P.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18177626. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NHL Enterprises, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jake Michael Christensen