This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 07:47:41 (UTC).

NHA CORPORATION v. CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 NHA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NHA CORPORATION

Defendant

CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EVAN E SMITH, IV

320 Residence Ave

Albany, GA 31701

F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV

Attorney at WATSON SPENCE

Po Box 2008

Albany, GA 31702-2008

Defendant Attorneys

ALYCEN A MOSS

1230 Peachtree St Ne Ste 400

Atlanta, GA 30309

DANIELLE C LE JEUNE

1230 Peachtree St Ne Ste 400

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#9

(#9) Jurisdictional Statement by NHA CORPORATION (MIDDLETON, F) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

8 #1

Required Form

#8

(#8) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/29/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY.(MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NHA CORPORATION (MIDDLETON, F) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#5

(#5) Jurisdictional Statement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent CHUBB LIMITED, Corporate Parent CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS INC, Corporate Parent CHUBB INA HOLDINGS INC for CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY. (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY. (bcl) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B-Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A-Superior Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against NHA CORPORATION Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3081818, $400 filed by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons)(Moss, Alycen) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Settlement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Jurisdictional Statement by NHA CORPORATION (MIDDLETON, F) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/29/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY.(MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NHA CORPORATION (MIDDLETON, F) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Jurisdictional Statement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY ); As to CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (bcl) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY ); As to NHA CORPORATION, pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (bcl) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent CHUBB LIMITED, Corporate Parent CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS INC, Corporate Parent CHUBB INA HOLDINGS INC for CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY. (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (MOSS, ALYCEN) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY. (bcl) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY ): Civil Cover Sheet was not filed. Please file a Civil Cover Sheet in relation to this case. (bcl) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against NHA CORPORATION Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3081818, $400 filed by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons)(Moss, Alycen) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less