This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:33:32 (UTC).

NGUYEN v. VU et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 NGUYEN filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against VU. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dabney L. Friedrich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00894

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dabney L. Friedrich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Quang Nguyen

Murphy, TX 75094

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Global Financial Group, Inc.

1875 I Street Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Global Real Estate Management, Inc.

1875 I Street Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Kimberly Vu

Sterling, VA 20166

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Amber Taliah Orr

Attorney at BERENZWEIG LEONARD, LLP

8300 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1250

Mclean, VA 22102

David M.E. Moon

Attorney at BERENZWEIG LEONARD, LLP

8300 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1250

Mclean, VA 22102

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jon D. Pels

Attorney at THE PELS LAW FIRM LLC

4845 Rugby Ave, 3Th Floor

Bethesda, MD 20814

 

Court Documents

#1

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

#15

(#15) MOTION for Scheduling Order by QUANG NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Moon, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#13

(#13) Partial MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by QUANG NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, David) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order

14 #1

Exhibit A

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for all Defendants by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #3

Text of Proposed Order

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response and Status Report due by 7/16/2019. Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 7/23/2019. (kh) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the defendants shall file their response to the plaintiff's #13 Partial Motion to Dismiss on or before July 16, 2019. The Court is not inclined to entertain any other requests for extensions of any deadlines moving forward absent extraordinary circumstances. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file a status report on or before July 16, 2019 informing the Court whether the defendants have been able to retain new counsel, at which point the Court will consider the #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for All Defendants. Given that the defendants are in the process of retaining new counsel and a responsive filing deadline will occur shortly, the court DENIES the plaintiff's #15 Motion for Scheduling Order as premature. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in accordance with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3 and file, on or before July 23, 2019, a joint meet and confer report as set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). After receiving the joint meet and confer report, the Court will set a scheduling conference unless the Court determines, on the basis of the report, that a conference is unnecessary. See Local Civil Rule 16.4. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 11, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Scheduling Order by QUANG NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Moon, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for all Defendants by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Partial MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by QUANG NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, David) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Counterclaim #11 by QUANG NGUYEN.(Moon, David) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against QUANG NGUYEN by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU.(Pels, Jon) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Moon, David) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Moon, David) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jon D. Pels on behalf of All Defendants (Pels, Jon) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or other responsive pleading due by 5/17/2019. (kh) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #4 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before May 17, 2019. The Court is not inclined to grant any further extensions of time for the answer or other responsive pleading. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the defendant's address of record. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 10, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by QUANG NGUYEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orr, Amber) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KIMBERLY VU. (tth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Taliah Orr on behalf of Quang Nguyen (Orr, Amber) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028798) filed by Quang Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Moon, David) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.