This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2022 at 20:30:46 (UTC).

Nguyen v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 Nguyen filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10510

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Nguyen

Vista, CA 92081

Defendants

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Cenlar Agency, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hashim Rahman

Attorney at Rahman Legal

43 West 43Rd Street Suite 204

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Mitra Paul Singh

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

800 Third Avenue, Ste 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Michael C. Hughes

Attorney at Houser LLP

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 2330

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Proposed Case Management Plan

19 #19

Main Document

#21

(#21) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The Court contemplates that any mediation will occur within 45 to 60 days of the date of this Order. Within the next two weeks, the parties shall disclose the targeted discovery materials discussed during today's initial pretrial conference. (See Minute Entry for February 1, 2022). If either Defendant reaches an agreement that results in their dismissal from the case, that Defendant shall be released from any disclosure obligations. SO ORDERED. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/1/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#20

(#20) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Hashim Rahman dated 01/27/22 re: #17 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated January 24, 2022. . Document filed by Brandon Nguyen..(Rahman, Hashim) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER with respect to #17 Letter Motion for Conference re: #17 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated January 24, 2022. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s above letter requesting a pre-motion conference in this matter. Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter on or before January 27, 2022. Additionally, the parties should be prepared to discuss Defendant's contemplated motion to dismiss at the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 1, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. (Dkt. #10). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 17. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/25/2022) (rro) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#17

(#17) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated January 24, 2022. Document filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc...(Singh, Mitra) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. Hughes on behalf of Cenlar Agency, Inc...(Hughes, Michael) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated December 22, 2021., #1 Notice of Removal. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 5. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. answer due 1/24/2022 (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/27/2021) (rro) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 3/22/2022. Mediation Status due by 4/21/2022. (mnp) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/22/2022 at 02:00 PM in telephone or video conference.(ah) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/10/2022.(ah) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The Court contemplates that any mediation will occur within 45 to 60 days of the date of this Order. Within the next two weeks, the parties shall disclose the targeted discovery materials discussed during today's initial pretrial conference. (See Minute Entry for February 1, 2022). If either Defendant reaches an agreement that results in their dismissal from the case, that Defendant shall be released from any disclosure obligations. SO ORDERED. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/1/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial/Pre-motion Conference held on 2/1/2022. Attorney Hashim Rahman representing Plaintiff present. Attorney Mitra Paul Singh representing Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. present. Attorney Michael C. Hughes representing Defendant Cenlar Agency, Inc. present. The Court will issue a mediation referral order for a mediation to take place in 45-60 days. The parties shall submit a joint status letter after mediation to inform the Court is mediation was successful or if the parties wish to continue to motion practice. (Court Reporter George Malinowski) (tn) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Hashim Rahman dated 01/27/22 re: #17 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated January 24, 2022. . Document filed by Brandon Nguyen..(Rahman, Hashim) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Hashim Rahman, Mitra Singh, and Michael C. Hughes dated 01/27/22 re: Joint Case Management Statement. Document filed by Brandon Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Plan).(Rahman, Hashim) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/27/2022 (rro) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER with respect to #17 Letter Motion for Conference re: #17 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated January 24, 2022. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s above letter requesting a pre-motion conference in this matter. Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter on or before January 27, 2022. Additionally, the parties should be prepared to discuss Defendant's contemplated motion to dismiss at the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 1, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. (Dkt. #10). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 17. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/25/2022) (rro) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated January 24, 2022. Document filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc...(Singh, Mitra) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. Hughes on behalf of Cenlar Agency, Inc...(Hughes, Michael) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated December 22, 2021., #1 Notice of Removal. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 5. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. answer due 1/24/2022 (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/27/2021) (rro) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Mitra Paul Singh dated December 22, 2021. Document filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc...(Singh, Mitra) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hashim Rahman on behalf of Brandon Nguyen..(Rahman, Hashim) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA) Inc. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Document filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc...(Singh, Mitra) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Singh, Mitra) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court of the City of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 024210-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25442139).Document filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal).(Singh, Mitra) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cenlar Agency, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitra Paul Singh