This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2021 at 07:51:26 (UTC).

Nguyen v. Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Nguyen filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-06087

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luan Cu Nguyen

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert T Tang

255 N. Market Street, Suite 244

San Jose, CA 95110

Defendant Attorneys

Suzanne Y. Badawi

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter Hampton LLP

333 S. Hope Street, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John T. Brooks

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Declaration of Sergio Ortiz

1 #2

Declaration of Suzanne Y. Badawi

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION #6 to Stay Action Pending Completion of Underlying UIM Arbitration Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Geico General Insurance Company.. (Badawi, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luan Cu Nguyen.. (Tang, Robert) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 8/27/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Action Pending Completion of Underlying UIM Arbitration Proceeding filed by Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Badawi, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#1) Answer to Removal Complaint (See Ex. C of Removal Complaint) by Geico General Insurance Company. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geico General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Geico Corporation for Geico General Insurance Company. (Badawi, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Geico General Insurance Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Badawi, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1441 from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 21CV382159. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16260415). Filed byGeico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sergio Ortiz, #2 Declaration of Suzanne Y. Badawi, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Badawi, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suzanne Badawi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T Brooks