This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2019 at 07:34:12 (UTC).

Nguyen v. Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by Nguyen against Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01939

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Edmund F. Brennan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Nguyen

Defendants

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC

504 Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brittany Victoria Berzin

Attorney at Shimoda Law Corp.

9401 E. Stockton Blvd., Suite 200

Elk Grove, CA 95624

Galen T. Shimoda

Attorney at Shimoda Law Corp.

9401 E. Stockton Blvd., Suite 200

Elk Grove, CA 95624

Defendant Attorneys

Lois Marie Kosch

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway, Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Nicole Rachelle Roysdon

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo, LLP

402 W. Broadway, Suite 1600, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

6 #4

Proposed Order

6 #2

Declaration of Galen T. Shimoda in Support of Plaintiff's Motio

6 #3

Declaration of Nancy Nguyen

6 #1

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

#6

(#6) MOTION to REMAND the Action to State Court by Nancy Nguyen. Attorney Shimoda, Galen T. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Galen T. Shimoda, #3 Declaration of Nancy Nguyen, #4 Proposed Order)(Shimoda, Galen) Modified on 10/28/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/2019 CONTINUING Hearing on #6 Motion to Remand to 2/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. All opposition and reply briefs due to be filed in connection with the Motion will now be due based on the newly set hearing dates and in accordance with the Local Rules. (York, M) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue #6 Motion to Remand by Nancy Nguyen. (Shimoda, Galen) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

5 #1

Proof of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicole Rachelle Roysdon on behalf of Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. Attorney Roysdon, Nicole Rachelle added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roysdon, Nicole) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

2 #1

Standing Order

2 #3

VDRP

2 #2

Consent Form

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Kosch, Lois) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

3 #1

Proof of Service

#3

(#3) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kosch, Lois) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

1 #7

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #6

Declaration

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 2/6/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 2/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due 1/24/2020. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/2019 CONTINUING Hearing on #6 Motion to Remand to 2/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. All opposition and reply briefs due to be filed in connection with the Motion will now be due based on the newly set hearing dates and in accordance with the Local Rules. (York, M) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue #6 Motion to Remand by Nancy Nguyen. (Shimoda, Galen) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to REMAND the Action to State Court by Nancy Nguyen. Attorney Shimoda, Galen T. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Galen T. Shimoda, #3 Declaration of Nancy Nguyen, #4 Proposed Order)(Shimoda, Galen) Modified on 10/28/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicole Rachelle Roysdon on behalf of Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. Attorney Roysdon, Nicole Rachelle added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roysdon, Nicole) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Kosch, Lois) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kosch, Lois) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00263185 by Cardinal Health, Inc. and Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8478833) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration, #7 Notice of Interested Parties, #8 Proof of Service)(Kosch, Lois) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.