This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2022 at 10:36:35 (UTC).

Nguyen et al v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Nguyen filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dee D Drell and Joseph H L Perez-Montes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01741

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

K & H Poultry Farms L L C

Khanh Nguyen

Defendant

Trisura Specialty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Allen Parrish, Jr

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan (BPK)

30338 Overseas Hwy Ste Unit 7

Big Pine Key, FL 33043

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Trisura Specialty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5146013) filed by Khanh Nguyen, K & H Poultry Farms L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Joseph Allen Parrish, Jr added to party K & H Poultry Farms L L C(pty:pla), Khanh Nguyen(pty:pla))(aty,Parrish, Joseph) Modified on 6/22/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K & H Poultry Farms L L C. (aty,Parrish, Joseph) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Case Management Order No. 1; Order Appointing Additional Neutrals; Civil Coversheet; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff, K&H Poultry Farms, LLC.; Exhibit A; Order for First-Party Insurance Property Damages Cases Arising from 2020 Hurricanes; Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damages Cases Arising from 2020 Hurricanes; Interim Protective Order; Exhibit 1; Exhibit B; Notice of Electronic Filing; $50.00 Acceptance Fee served on 1 on 07/08/2022, filed by Khanh Nguyen. (aty,Parrish, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Khanh Nguyen. Trisura Specialty Insurance Co served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 5 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 7/28/2022 to add document number.(Crick, S). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Case Management Order No. 1; Order Appointing Additional Neutrals; Civil Coversheet; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff, K&H Poultry Farms, LLC.; Exhibit A; Order for First-Party Insurance Property Damages Cases Arising from 2020 Hurricanes; Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damages Cases Arising from 2020 Hurricanes; Interim Protective Order; Exhibit 1; Exhibit B; Notice of Electronic Filing; $50.00 Acceptance Fee served on 1 on 07/08/2022, filed by Khanh Nguyen. (aty,Parrish, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K & H Poultry Farms L L C. (aty,Parrish, Joseph) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Trisura Specialty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5146013) filed by Khanh Nguyen, K & H Poultry Farms L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Joseph Allen Parrish, Jr added to party K & H Poultry Farms L L C(pty:pla), Khanh Nguyen(pty:pla))(aty,Parrish, Joseph) Modified on 6/22/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant