3:22-CV-02456
11/02/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Immigration - Other Immigration
Brantley Starr
Van Tho Nguyen
Thi Lien Huong Tran
Loi Dinh Pham
Huyen T Tran
Hung Gia Pham
D T P
Huyen Thuy Thanh Do
Dung Tien Pham
D M P
Tran Mai Trang Nguyen
Alejandro Mayorkas
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Donna Campagnolo
Merrick B Garland
Trang Mai Thao Nguyen
Michael Hoc Cao
Amy M Hsu
Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
RESTRICTED
RESTRICTED
RESTRICTED
RESTRICTED
RESTRICTED
RESTRICTED
(#8) MEMORANDUM OPINION: Because the Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate why this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over their claims, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this case, and grants the plaintiffs 28 days to refile their complaint and address the Court's concerns. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/11/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 11/11/2022)
Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hung Gia Pham, Thi Lien Huong Tran, Loi Dinh Pham, Huyen T Tran, Dung Tien Pham, Huyen Thuy Thanh Do, Van Tho Nguyen, Tran Mai Trang Nguyen, D M P, D T P, Tran Mai Thao Nguyen. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Hsu, Amy) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/10/2022 to flatten pdf) (axm). (Entered: 12/08/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) MEMORANDUM OPINION: Because the Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate why this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over their claims, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this case, and grants the plaintiffs 28 days to refile their complaint and address the Court's concerns. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/11/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 11/11/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response filed by Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ on behalf of Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy M Hsu for Michael Cao on behalf of Huyen Thuy Thanh Do, Tran Mai Trang Nguyen, Tran Mai Thao Nguyen, Van Tho Nguyen, D M P, D T P, Dung Tien Pham, Hung Gia Pham, Loi Dinh Pham, Huyen T Tran, Thi Lien Huong Tran. (Hsu, Amy) (Entered: 11/09/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Summons issued as to Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ndt) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hung Gia Pham, Thi Lien Huong Tran, Loi Dinh Pham, Huyen T Tran, Dung Tien Pham, Huyen Thuy Thanh Do, Van Tho Nguyen, D M P, D T P, Tran Mai Thao Nguyen. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13274844) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Hsu, Amy) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
[-] Read Less