This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2023 at 09:05:56 (UTC).

Nguyen et al v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 Nguyen filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02456

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Van Tho Nguyen

Thi Lien Huong Tran

Loi Dinh Pham

Huyen T Tran

Hung Gia Pham

D T P

Huyen Thuy Thanh Do

Dung Tien Pham

D M P

Tran Mai Trang Nguyen

Defendants

Alejandro Mayorkas

Ur Mendoza Jaddou

Donna Campagnolo

Merrick B Garland

Trang Mai Thao Nguyen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Hoc Cao

Amy M Hsu

Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM OPINION: Because the Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate why this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over their claims, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this case, and grants the plaintiffs 28 days to refile their complaint and address the Court's concerns. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/11/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hung Gia Pham, Thi Lien Huong Tran, Loi Dinh Pham, Huyen T Tran, Dung Tien Pham, Huyen Thuy Thanh Do, Van Tho Nguyen, Tran Mai Trang Nguyen, D M P, D T P, Tran Mai Thao Nguyen. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Hsu, Amy) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/10/2022 to flatten pdf) (axm). (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM OPINION: Because the Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate why this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over their claims, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this case, and grants the plaintiffs 28 days to refile their complaint and address the Court's concerns. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/11/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response filed by Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ on behalf of Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy M Hsu for Michael Cao on behalf of Huyen Thuy Thanh Do, Tran Mai Trang Nguyen, Tran Mai Thao Nguyen, Van Tho Nguyen, D M P, D T P, Dung Tien Pham, Hung Gia Pham, Loi Dinh Pham, Huyen T Tran, Thi Lien Huong Tran. (Hsu, Amy) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued as to Donna Campagnolo, Merrick B Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ndt) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hung Gia Pham, Thi Lien Huong Tran, Loi Dinh Pham, Huyen T Tran, Dung Tien Pham, Huyen Thuy Thanh Do, Van Tho Nguyen, D M P, D T P, Tran Mai Thao Nguyen. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13274844) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Hsu, Amy) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less