This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2019 at 07:32:41 (UTC).

NGL Energy Partners, LP v. Blitz Energy Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 NGL Energy Partners, LP filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Blitz Energy Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terence Kern and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terence Kern

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGL Energy Partners, LP

Defendants

Borsheim Crane Service, LLC

Influx Capital, LLC

Addy Source, LLC

Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC

SPG Advance, LLC

United States of America

RDL Excavation & Construction, LLC

Po Box 149

Loving, NM 88256

Blitz Energy Services, LLC

Borshem Crane Service, LLC

Receiver

Harold Kessler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dylan Tyler Duren

Attorney at Robinett Swartz & Aycock

624 S Boston Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119

Tracy Wayne Robinett

Attorney at Robinett Swartz & Aycock

624 S Boston Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119

Defendant and Receiver Attorneys

Courtney Jo Davis Powell

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP OKC)

9400 N Broadway Extension Ste 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

Shannon F Davies

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP (OKC)

9400 N Broadway Ext Ste 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114

Jared Scott Wiesner

Attorney at US Department of Justice (Tax-Box 8832)

555 4Th St Nw, Room 8832

Washington, DC 20001

William H Hoch

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jordan Sessler

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Elliot Paul Anderson

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Borsheim Crane Service, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#4

(#4) ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#2

(#4) ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion (filed in State Court) (Re: #8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) ) by Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC ; (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 6/4/2019 to edit docket text (dlg, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for ancillary Receivership status (filed in State Court) by Harold Kessler (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion (filed in State Court) (Re: #8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) ) by Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC ; (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 6/4/2019 to edit docket text (dlg, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • (#37) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Blitz Energy Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #32 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #31 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #30 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #29 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Borsheim Crane Service, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against SPG Advance, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Influx Capital, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Addy Source, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blitz Energy Services, LLC (Hoch, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing NGL Energy Partners, LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2019-1803 by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to Motion (filed in State Court) (Re: #8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) ) by Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC ; (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 6/4/2019 to edit docket text (dlg, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for ancillary Receivership status (filed in State Court) by Harold Kessler (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (filed in State Court) (Re: #8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) ) by Harold Kessler ; (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by NGL Energy Partners, LP (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less