This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2022 at 11:00:03 (UTC).

Ng et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 Ng filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen Lipton Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01947

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen Lipton Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GET NG

PETER NG

Defendant

Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James A Lanier

Attorney at The Law Office of Peter T. Nicholl

36 S Charles Street, Suite 1700

Baltimore, MD 21201

Neil Dubovsky

Attorney at Dubo Law, LLC

704, 9515 Deereco Road

Timonium, MD 21093

Defendant Attorney

Scott Hamilton Phillips

Attorney at Franklin & Prokopik

2 N. Charles Street, Suite 600

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Dubovsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dubovsky, Neil) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 103.5(Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE re #6 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#6

(#6) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

4 #2

Jury Demand

4 #1

Civil Case Information Report

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company (Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Hamilton Phillips on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit 6 - Letter to Commissioner re Writ of Summons

1 #7

Exhibit 5 - Request for Spoken Language Interpreter

1 #6

Exhibit 4 - Prayer for Jury Trial

1 #5

Exhibit 3 - Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report

1 #4

Exhibit 2 - Summons

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

1 #2

Attachment Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Dubovsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dubovsky, Neil) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 103.5(Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE re #6 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Docket(#5) THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Cincinnati Insurance Company, filed by Get NG, Peter NG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Information Report, #2 Jury Demand)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company (Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Hamilton Phillips on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-22-002603. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10088122), filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #5 Exhibit 3 - Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report, #6 Exhibit 4 - Prayer for Jury Trial, #7 Exhibit 5 - Request for Spoken Language Interpreter, #8 Exhibit 6 - Letter to Commissioner re Writ of Summons)(Phillips, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Hamilton Phillips