This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2022 at 08:09:04 (UTC).

nFusion Capital LLC v. Public Service Enterprise Group Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 nFusion Capital LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Public Service Enterprise Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00957

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

nFusion Capital LLC

Defendants

Atlantic LED, LLC

Justin Kim

TRC Companies, Inc.

Public Service Enterprise Group Inc. also known as Public Service Electric Gas Co. doing business as PSE&G

Public Service Electric Gas Co.

Eun H. Choi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason M. Medley

Attorney at LeClairRyan

1233 West Loop South, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77027

Trevor A. Hall

Attorney at Spencer Fane, LLP

3040 Post Oak Boulevard, Ste 1300

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorney

Bradley E. Chambers

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

1301 Mckinney - Ste 3700

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by nFusion Capital LLC. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rn) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#4

(#4) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by nFusion Capital LLC. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. TRC Companies, Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Eun H. Choi served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#7

(#7) TRC Companies, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Bradley E. Chambers added to party TRC Companies, Inc.(pty:dft) by TRC Companies, Inc..(Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Atlantic LED, LLC served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Justin Kim served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Public Service Enterprise Group Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Public Service Enterprise Group Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Justin Kim served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Atlantic LED, LLC served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRC Companies, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Bradley E. Chambers added to party TRC Companies, Inc.(pty:dft) by TRC Companies, Inc..(Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. Eun H. Choi served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by nFusion Capital LLC. TRC Companies, Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by nFusion Capital LLC. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rn) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (rn) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by nFusion Capital LLC. (Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16549107), filed by nFusion Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hall, Trevor) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less