This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:17:45 (UTC).

NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC v. Shell Energy North America (US), LP

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shell Energy North America US , LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02280

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC

Defendant

Shell Energy North America (US), LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alicia Fazzano Castro

Claire Alexandra Armstrong

David E Harrell, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Dawn Estes

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shell Energy North America (US), LP, filed.(Estes, Dawn) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC, filed.(Harrell, David) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Answer is due by October 01, 2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Shell Energy North America (US), LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Estes, Dawn) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 06/14/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 07/14/2022. Discovery due by 08/30/2022. Mediation due by 11/15/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/29/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/29/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2022. Docket Call set for 01/23/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (%(username)) (Entered: 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Shell Energy North America (US), LP served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021, filed.(Harrell, David) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Shell Energy North America (US), LP. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Shell Energy North America (US), LP, filed.(Harrell, David) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Shell Energy North America (US), LP (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26744994) filed by Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrell, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less