This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 11:02:58 (UTC).

Nexstar Media Inc. v. Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Nexstar Media Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01358

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nexstar Media Inc.

Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.

Defendant

Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Thompson Bayliss

Daniel John McBride

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly E. Farnan

Howard J. Symons

Lina R. Powell

Megan B. Poetzel

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. Reply Brief due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 12/8/2021. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/24/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

21 #1

Exhibit 1

#21

(#21) DECLARATION of Lindsey Barnhart re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition by Nexstar Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#20

(#20) DECLARATION of Dana Zimmer re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition by Nexstar Media Inc. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#19

(#19) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer the Action to the Southern District of New York, or in the Alternative, to Stay or Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Nexstar Media Inc. Reply Brief due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 12/8/2021. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware - filed by Nexstar Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 10/28/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#11

(#19) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer the Action to the Southern District of New York, or in the Alternative, to Stay or Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Nexstar Media Inc. Reply Brief due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 12/8/2021. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#10

(#18) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware filed by Nexstar Media Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 11/23/2021. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 10/28/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

2 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #4

Exhibit A-B

2 #3

Exhibit C to the Notice of Removal

2 #2

Exhibit B to the Notice of Removal

2 #1

Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal

#2

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. Reply Brief due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 12/8/2021. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/24/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) DECLARATION of Lindsey Barnhart re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition by Nexstar Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) DECLARATION of Dana Zimmer re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition by Nexstar Media Inc. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer the Action to the Southern District of New York, or in the Alternative, to Stay or Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Nexstar Media Inc. Reply Brief due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 12/8/2021. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware filed by Nexstar Media Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 11/23/2021. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 10/28/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware - filed by Nexstar Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 10/28/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nexstar Media Group, Inc. for Nexstar Media Inc. filed by Nexstar Media Inc.. (McBride, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/15/2021 (mdb). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Lina R. Powell for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Howard J. Symons, Megan B. Poetzel for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
10/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REDACTED VERSION of #3 Exhibit to a Document by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Charter Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation, Other Affiliate CCH II, LLC, Other Affiliate CCH Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Insight Blocker, Other Affiliate Advance Newhouse Partnership for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER: Defendant's Motion is GRANTED (D.I. #1 ). Defendant's Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A of its Notice of Removal may be filed Under Seal. Defendant SHALL file a redacted public version of the Exhibit in no more than five (5) days.. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/27/2021. (twk) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021

DocketRemark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge (CFC). (twk) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021

DocketNo Summons Issued. (twk) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) [SEALED] EXHIBIT 1 to Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal re #2 Notice of Removal, by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N21C-08-086 AML (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3708011)- filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to the Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to the Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (twk). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Defendant's MOTION to file Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A of the Notice of Removal under seal - filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (twk). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less