This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 08:06:28 (UTC).

Nexstar Media Inc. v. NewsnationUSA.com et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Nexstar Media Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against NewsnationUSA com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01047

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nexstar Media Inc.

Defendants

NewsnationUSA.com

John Does 1-9

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ari Scott Meltzer

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP (DC N/A)

1776 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Spencer Christian Brooks

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP (DC N/A)

1776 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Attison Leonard Barnes, III

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP (DC)

1776 K St, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Service by Publication by Nexstar Media Inc. (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/3/2021. (dest) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#11

(#11) Notice of Hearing Date Friday, November 5, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. re #8 MOTION for Service by Publication (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#10

(#10) Waiver of re #8 MOTION for Service by Publication Hearing by Nexstar Media Inc. (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit A Declaration of Ari S. Meltzer

#9

(#9) Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Ari S. Meltzer)(Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Service by Publication by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ari Scott Meltzer for Nexstar Media Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/30/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Spencer Christian Brooks for Nexstar Media Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/30/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ari Scott Meltzer and Certification of Local Counsel Attison Leonard Barnes, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8023378. by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer Christian Brooks and Certification of Local Counsel Attison Leonard Barnes, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8023337. by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Report on the filing of an action. (kgall) (C/S to Trademark Office) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Service by Publication by Nexstar Media Inc. (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/3/2021. (dest) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. #8 MOTION for Service by Publication (clar, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Service by Publication . Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Hearing Date Friday, November 5, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. re #8 MOTION for Service by Publication (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of re #8 MOTION for Service by Publication Hearing by Nexstar Media Inc. (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Ari S. Meltzer)(Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Service by Publication by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ari Scott Meltzer for Nexstar Media Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/30/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Spencer Christian Brooks for Nexstar Media Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/30/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ari Scott Meltzer and Certification of Local Counsel Attison Leonard Barnes, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8023378. by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer Christian Brooks and Certification of Local Counsel Attison Leonard Barnes, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8023337. by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the filing of an action. (kgall) (C/S to Trademark Office) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (kgall) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7992922.), filed by Nexstar Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nexstar Media Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ari Scott Meltzer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Attison Leonard Barnes, III