This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2022 at 08:41:36 (UTC).

Nexeo Plastics, LLC et al v. M. Holland Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 Nexeo Plastics, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against M Holland Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01715

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GDP Companies Parent, Inc.

Nexeo Plastics, LLC

Nexeo Plastics Parent, Inc.

Defendants

M. Holland Company

Joseph C. Halsey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra M. Cumings

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Kevin Michael Coen

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorneys

Renee Mosley Delcollo

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Travis Steven Hunter

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Chad W. Moeller

Corinne N. Biller

Sonya Rosenberg

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Stay Order by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. (Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and Transfer to January 11, 2022 - filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. (Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

22 #1

Exhibit A

#22

(#22) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kevin M. Coen regarding dispute over a protective order. (Cumings, Alexandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #1 Exhibit A) (ntl). (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, and (2) Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC.(Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) M. Holland Company's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; 2) Joseph C. Halsey's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; and 3) Joseph C. Halsey's Objections and Answers to First Set of Interrogatories filed by Joseph C. Halsey, M. Holland Company.(Delcollo, Renee) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#16

SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew W. Walch and Linda Qiu filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/29/21. (ntl) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#26) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #14 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue filed by Joseph C. Halsey, M. Holland Company is DENIED without prejudice to renew when the stay is lifted. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/20/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

6 #2

Certification Under D. Del. LR 7.1.1

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit B

#2

(#3) EXHIBIT A re #2 Notice of Removal - filed by Joseph C. Halsey, M. Holland Company. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#5) ORAL ORDER: The motion (D.I. #1 ) is insufficient to justify sealing any documents. It is not enough that it was filed under seal in the Court of Chancery. I do not see any trade secrets or the like in the documents. The motion to seal is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2021. (nms) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #14 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue filed by Joseph C. Halsey, M. Holland Company is DENIED without prejudice to renew when the stay is lifted. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/20/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #25 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Stay Order filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/20/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Stay Order by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. (Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#24) ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter regarding a dispute over the protective order (D.I. 22), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' position is ADOPTED. Plaintiffs have established good cause for depriving the individual Defendant, Mr. Halsey, of discovery material designated Attorneys' Eyes Only ("AEO"), given that he is "a member of senior management at Plaintiffs' competitor" (id. at 2) and affording him full access to AEO information would "work a clearly defined and serious injury" to Plaintiffs. Pansy v. Borough of Stroudsburg, 23 F.3d 772, 786 (3d Cir. 1994). The protective order permits Mr. Halsey to access confidential information if he is "the author or any recipient of a document containing the information or a custodian or other person who otherwise possessed or knew the information." (D.I. 22 Ex. A 7.3(e)) In the event Mr. Halsey's attorneys see any AEO material produced by Plaintiffs that they believe may be necessary to share with their client so that he may "understand the claims against him and defend himself against such claims" (D.I. 22 at 3), they may seek Plaintiffs' consent to do so, and such consent may not be unreasonably withheld. Any resulting disputes may be brought to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/12/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and Transfer to January 11, 2022 filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/12/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and Transfer to January 11, 2022 - filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. (Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kevin M. Coen regarding dispute over a protective order. (Cumings, Alexandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #1 Exhibit A) (ntl). (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, and (2) Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC.(Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) M. Holland Company's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; 2) Joseph C. Halsey's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; and 3) Joseph C. Halsey's Objections and Answers to First Set of Interrogatories filed by Joseph C. Halsey, M. Holland Company.(Delcollo, Renee) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew W. Walch and Linda Qiu filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/29/21. (ntl) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite ; Plaintiffs' Opening Brief In Support Of Motion To Expedite filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/27/2021. (Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite - filed by GDP Companies Parent, Inc., Nexeo Plastics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification Under D. Del. LR 7.1.1)(Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (twk) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORAL ORDER: The motion (D.I. #1 ) is insufficient to justify sealing any documents. It is not enough that it was filed under seal in the Court of Chancery. I do not see any trade secrets or the like in the documents. The motion to seal is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2021. (nms) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketRemark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge (RGA). (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT A re #2 Notice of Removal - filed by Joseph C. Halsey, M. Holland Company. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Court of Chancery, Case Number 21-01024 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3755804)- filed by M. Holland Company, Joseph C. Halsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to File Exhibit A under seal - filed by Joseph C. Halsey, M. Holland Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad W. Moeller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Renee Mosley Delcollo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis Steven Hunter