This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:25:10 (UTC).

Newton v. Owens et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Newton against Owens in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Dudley H. Bowen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Willie E. Newton

Defendants

William Curry

Brian Owens

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in accordance with #7 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations, DENYING as MOOT #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, DISMISSING this case without prejudice, and CLOSING this civil action. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER directing service of #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED AS MOOT and the #1 Complaint filed by Willie E. Newton be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the Court whether he intends to proceed with a 1983 complaint or a habeas petition within 14 days of the date of this Order (Compliance due by 9/6/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/23/2019. (pts) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie E. Newton. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Willie E. Newton.(pts) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in accordance with #7 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations, DENYING as MOOT #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, DISMISSING this case without prejudice, and CLOSING this civil action. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER directing service of #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED AS MOOT and the #1 Complaint filed by Willie E. Newton be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/16/2019. (maa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the Court whether he intends to proceed with a 1983 complaint or a habeas petition within 14 days of the date of this Order (Compliance due by 9/6/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/23/2019. (pts) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Inmate Account Statement by Willie E. Newton. (pts) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie E. Newton. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Willie E. Newton.(pts) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.