Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2020 at 11:39:08 (UTC).

Newton v. Matson Navigation Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Newton filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Matson Navigation Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are WES REBER PORTER and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00334

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tashara Newton

Honolulu, HI 96817

Defendants

Doe Associates 1-20

Matson Navigation Co., Inc.

555 12Th Street

Oakland, CA 94607

John Does 1-20

Doe Governmental Agencies 1-20

Doe Partnerships 1-20

Mary Does 1-20

M/V Manoa

Doe Corporations 1-20

Other Entities 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis E.W. O'Connor, Jr.

Attorney at O'Connor Playdon Guben & Inouye LLP

733 Bishop St 24Th Floor, 524-8350

Honolulu, HI 96813

Jay L Friedheim

Attorney at Iwilei Center

866 Iwilei Road Suite 201

Honolulu, HI 96817

Defendant Attorney

Normand R. Lezy

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Scheduling Conference Statement by Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tashara Newton (re: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO BOARD, INSPECT AND PHOTOGRAPH VESSEL (Long Beach, California); and PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO BOARD, INSPECT AND PHOTOGRAPH VESSEL (Honolulu, Hawaii)) (O'Connor, Dennis) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Matson Navigation Co., Inc..(Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tashara Newton. Matson Navigation Co., Inc. served on 8/26/2020. (O'Connor, Dennis) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to M/V Manoa, Matson Navigation Co., Inc. (jni) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

4 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

4 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons

#4

(#4) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

3 #1

Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#3

(#3) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 9/28/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Demand for Jury

1 #1

Verification

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tashara Newton. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Demand for Jury, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 (Proposed) Summons)(Friedheim, Jay) Docket Text Modified on 7/31/2020 (jni). Modified on 8/3/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Scheduling Conference Statement by Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tashara Newton (re: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO BOARD, INSPECT AND PHOTOGRAPH VESSEL (Long Beach, California); and PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO BOARD, INSPECT AND PHOTOGRAPH VESSEL (Honolulu, Hawaii)) (O'Connor, Dennis) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Matson Navigation Co., Inc..(Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tashara Newton. Matson Navigation Co., Inc. served on 8/26/2020. (O'Connor, Dennis) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 09/28/2020 is CONTINUED to 12/07/2020 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to M/V Manoa, Matson Navigation Co., Inc. (jni) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 9/28/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00334 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tashara Newton. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Demand for Jury, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 (Proposed) Summons)(Friedheim, Jay) Docket Text Modified on 7/31/2020 (jni). Modified on 8/3/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Normand R. Lezy