This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 10:03:22 (UTC).

Newtok Village v. Lynden Air Cargo, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 Newtok Village filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Burgess. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M. Burgess

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Newtok Village

Defendants

Lynden Air Cargo, LLC

Lynden Air Cargo, LLC doing business as Lynden Air Cargo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Walleri

Attorney at Gazewood & Weiner, P.C.

1008 16Th Avenue, Suite 200

Fairbanks, AK 99701

Defendant Attorney

Thomas G. Waller

Attorney at Bauer Moynihan & Johnson LLP

2101 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2400

Seattle, WA 98121

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION FOR REMAND BY THE PARTIES by Newtok Village.(Walleri, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of state court filings by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Newtok Village. (Walleri, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#9

(#9) INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/1/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC (Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Thomas Waller re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Thomas Waller re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Copy of complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC from Alaska Superior Court, 4th Judicial District at Bethel, case number 4BE-20-86 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2853796), filed by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of complaint)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION FOR REMAND BY THE PARTIES by Newtok Village.(Walleri, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of state court filings by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TMB TEXT ORDER vacating re #9 Initial Case Status Report Order pursuant to MGO 20-11. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Newtok Village. (Walleri, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/1/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC (Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC.(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Thomas Waller re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Thomas Waller re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC from Alaska Superior Court, 4th Judicial District at Bethel, case number 4BE-20-86 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2853796), filed by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of complaint)(Waller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less