This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:34:11 (UTC).

Newsome et al v. Philips North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Newsome filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Philips North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-04101

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Johnny Lee Newsome, Jr.

Debra L. Newsome

Devon Newsome

Tylar Newsome

Brandon Newsome

Defendants

Philips North America, LLC

Koninklijke Philips N.V.

Philips RS North America LLC

Respironics, Inc.

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

The Permanente Medical Group Inc.

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Kaiser Permanente

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Seitz

Attorney at Frost Law Firm, PC

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Scott L. Frost

Attorney at Frost Law Firm, PC

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Paul C. Cook

Attorney at Frost Law Firm, PC

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Howard Steinberg

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP

1888 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William B. Monahan

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004-2498

Molly Moriarty Lane

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

John P. Lavelle, Jr.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis and Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Stay) filed by Philips North America, LLC. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 8/10/2022) Modified on 8/11/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#25

(#25) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #24 Ex Parte Application.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

24 #2

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVA

24 #24

Main Document

8 #4

Proposed Order

8 #3

Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

8 #8

Main Document

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G - Transfer Order

1 #6

Exhibit F - Respironics Inc. Incorporation Information.

1 #5

Exhibit E - Philips Holding USA Inc. Corporate Records & Business Registrations

1 #4

Exhibit D - Philips North America LLC Corporate Records & Business Registrations

1 #3

Exhibit C - Philips RS North America Holding Corporation Corporate Records & Bus

1 #2

Exhibit B - Philips RS North America LLC Corporate Records & Business Registrati

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Stay) filed by Philips North America, LLC. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 8/10/2022) Modified on 8/11/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #24 Ex Parte Application.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Ex Parte Application re #16 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Brandon Newsome, Debra L. Newsome, Devon Newsome, Estate of Johnny Lee Newsome, Jr, Tylar Newsome. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul C. Cook in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Plaintiffs Motion for Remand, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Plaintiffs Motion for Remand) (Cook, Paul) (Filed on 8/9/2022) Modified on 8/9/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Philips North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Remand)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 8/8/2022) Modified on 8/9/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL*** Judge name or initials are incorrect. All future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case n umber instead of LB. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re: #22 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Brandon Newsome, Devon Newsome, Tylar Newsome, Debra L. Newsome, Estate of Johnny Lee Newsome, Jr. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Plaintiffs' OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Stay) pending Transfer to MDL NO. 3014; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Brandon Newsome, Debra L. Newsome, Devon Newsome, Estate of Johnny Lee Newsome, Jr, Tylar Newsome. (Cook, Paul) (Filed on 8/3/2022) Modified on 8/4/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brandon Newsome, Debra L. Newsome, Devon Newsome, Estate of Johnny Lee Newsome, Jr, Tylar Newsome re #16 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Seitz, Andrew) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Hearing as to #8 MOTION to Stay, See Docket No. #19 : Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Philips North America, LLC of Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Renotice motion hearing (re #8 MOTION to Stay) filed by Philips North America, LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 7/26/2022) Modified on 7/27/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing #8 MOTION to Stay set for 8/25/2022 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/3/2022. Replies due by 8/10/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.ca nd.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay filed by Philips North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/3/2022. Replies due by 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Philips North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V. for Philips North America, LLC. (Steinberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Howard Steinberg (Steinberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Moriarty Lane (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips RS North America LLC, Respironics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Philips RS North America Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap, Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA Inc. for Philips RS North America LLC; Corporate Parent Philips RS North America LLC, Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap for Respironics, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 7/13/2022) Modified on 7/14/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with Jury Demand by Plaintiff) (fees paid $402.00, Tracking id: ACANDC-17346840, Approval code: 096473) from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV012857. (). Filed byPhilips North America, LLC, Respironics, Inc., Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Philips RS North America LLC Corporate Records & Business Registrations, #3 Exhibit C - Philips RS North America Holding Corporation Corporate Records & Business Registrations, #4 Exhibit D - Philips North America LLC Corporate Records & Business Registrations, #5 Exhibit E - Philips Holding USA Inc. Corporate Records & Business Registrations, #6 Exhibit F - Respironics Inc. Incorporation Information., #7 Exhibit G - Transfer Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 7/13/2022) Modified on 7/14/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Philips RS North America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RESPIRONICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant