This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2023 at 07:53:16 (UTC).

Newrez LLC et al v. John Brosnan et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Newrez LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against John Brosnan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-08822

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NewRez LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

Defendants

DOES I through X, inclusive

John Brosnan

Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC

Roe Corporations

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alejandro P Pacheco

Ariel E Stern

Natalie L Winslow

 

Court Documents

38 #1

Exhibit 1

#38

(#38) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff NewRez LLC, re Preliminary Injunction,, #36 served on 01/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#37

(#37) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #23 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#36

(#36) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS JOHN BROSNAN, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, AND SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, LLC by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants John Brosnan, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC, as well as their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all others in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Preliminary Injunction by personal service or otherwise. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#35

(#35) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff NewRez LLC, re Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #33 , Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #34 , Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #32 served on 01/25/2023. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#34

(#34) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, a California Corporation (Infringing Entity 2). (iv) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#33

(#33) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, a California Corporation (Infringing Entity 1). (iv) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#32

(#32) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to John Brosnan. (iv) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#23

(#37) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #23 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Pacheco, Alejandro) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Pacheco, Alejandro) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Pacheco, Alejandro) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company identifying Shellpoint Partners LLC as Corporate Parent. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Pacheco, Alejandro) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff NewRez LLC, re Preliminary Injunction,, #36 served on 01/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #23 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS JOHN BROSNAN, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, AND SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, LLC by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants John Brosnan, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC, as well as their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all others in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Preliminary Injunction by personal service or otherwise. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff NewRez LLC, re Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #33 , Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #34 , Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #32 served on 01/25/2023. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, a California Corporation (Infringing Entity 2). (iv) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, a California Corporation (Infringing Entity 1). (iv) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to John Brosnan. (iv) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, a California Corporation (Infringing Entity 2) Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC filed by plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, a California Corporation (Infringing Entity 1) Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing filed by plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant John Brosnan John Brosnan filed by plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Pacheco, Alejandro) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Pacheco, Alejandro) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Pacheco, Alejandro) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company identifying Shellpoint Partners LLC as Corporate Parent. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34426801 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Natalie L Winslow added to party NEWREZ LLC dba SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:pla))(Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less