This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:16:08 (UTC).

Newquist et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Newquist filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00324

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anna L. Newquist

Carroll Newquist

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael B. Smith

Attorney at Fanelli, Evans & Patel, P.C.

1 Mahantongo Street

Pottsville, PA 17901

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph J. Shields

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP

1065 Highway 315, Ste 403

Wilkes-Barre, PA 18702

Ryan C. Blazure

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer, LLP

1065 Highway 315, Ste 403

Wilkes-Barre, PA 18702

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Aaron S. Decker

Attorney at Decker Law

480 Pierce Street, Suite 106

Kingston, PA 18704

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER re #13 Order Referring Case to Mediation, #14 Letter - Doc. 13 Order STAYED pending expiration of discovery deadline on 10/11/22. Plaintiff counsel to notify Court when matter is ready for mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/14/22. (ms) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#14

(#14) Letter from MICHAEL SMITH, ESQUIRE TO JUDGE SAPORITO. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#13

(#13) [STAYED PENDING EXPIRATIION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE PER DOC. 15 ORDER] ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Aaron S. Decker,Aaron S. Decker for Mediator added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/12/22. (ms) Modified on 4/14/2022 (ms). (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2022. Discovery due by 10/11/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 12/11/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 1/11/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2022. Motions due by 12/11/2022. Supplemental due by 1/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/11/22. (ms) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#9

(#9) CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#8

(#8) REPLY by Anna L. Newquist, Carroll Newquist. TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Attached scheduling order to be completed and returned to Court 3 business days prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/30/22. (ms) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Agreement of counsel re: amendments to Complaint. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/28/22. (dw) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

4 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#4

(#4) MOTION Approve Stipulation of Counsel by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#3

(#3) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/6/2022 (ms) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Anna L. Newquist, Carroll Newquist YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/6/2022 (ms) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re #13 Order Referring Case to Mediation, #14 Letter - Doc. 13 Order STAYED pending expiration of discovery deadline on 10/11/22. Plaintiff counsel to notify Court when matter is ready for mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/14/22. (ms) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter from MICHAEL SMITH, ESQUIRE TO JUDGE SAPORITO. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) [STAYED PENDING EXPIRATIION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE PER DOC. 15 ORDER] ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Aaron S. Decker,Aaron S. Decker for Mediator added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/12/22. (ms) Modified on 4/14/2022 (ms). (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2022. Discovery due by 10/11/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 12/11/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 1/11/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2022. Motions due by 12/11/2022. Supplemental due by 1/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/11/22. (ms) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY by Anna L. Newquist, Carroll Newquist. TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Attached scheduling order to be completed and returned to Court 3 business days prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/30/22. (ms) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Agreement of counsel re: amendments to Complaint. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/28/22. (dw) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION Approve Stipulation of Counsel by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/6/2022 (ms) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Anna L. Newquist, Carroll Newquist YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/6/2022 (ms) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2022-00772. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5869281) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant