This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2022 at 07:37:18 (UTC).

Newman v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On May 11, 2022, Steven Newman (“Newman” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Yosef Peretz of Peretz & Associates, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Google LLC (“Google” or “Defendant”), seeking damages for alleged employment law violations pertaining to Newman’s employment at Google. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with Judge Nathanael M. Cousins presiding.

In the complaint, Plaintiff claimed that “Newman was a highly dedicated employee of Google, a company located and headquartered in Santa Clara County, California, since 2018.”

Plaintiff further claimed that “in July 2020, Newman was diagnosed with bipolar disorder for the first time in his life, and was then placed on a short-term disability leave.”

Plaintiff alleged that “as a result of his disorder, in October 2020, Newman sent a few unusual emails to his colleagues at Google. Although none of his emails were malicious or genuinely threatening, on October 30, 2020, Google’s Human Resources personnel informed Newman that once his short-term disability leave was over, he would be placed on an administrative leave because of his emails. Newman’s administrative leave was periodically extended by Google throughout the rest of 2020 and early 2021.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged that “on April 9, 2021, Newman was notified that he was being terminated without severance for allegedly violating Google’s Code of Conduct. At no time did Google engage in the process of finding appropriate accommodations for Newman’s condition, despite being on notice since July 2020. Newman’s employment with Google was terminated effective April 13, 2021.”

Plaintiff presented sixteen claims for relief alleging disability discrimination, failure to accommodate a disability, failure to engage in the interactive disability accommodation process, retaliation in violation of the ADA and the FEHA, disparate treatment and disparate impact, wrongful termination in violation of California Public Policy and Georgia Public Policy, intentional infliction of emotional distress, negligent infliction of emotional distress under California Law and Georgia Law, and unlawful, unfair, and fraudulent business practices in violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code §§ 17200 and 17203, et seq.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested an award of past and future wages, earnings, salary, bonuses, stock and other employment benefits.  Plaintiff also requested additional economic and non-economic losses and costs incurred by Newman, and general, consequential and punitive damages.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02799

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nathanael M. Cousins

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Newman

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Garibaldi

Attorney at Peretz and Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Brian Lee Johnsrud

Attorney at Curley Hurtgen & Johnsrud LLP

4400 Bohannon Drive, Suite 230

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2022 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2022 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2022) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2022) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Newman.. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/12/2022) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Steven Newman . Google, LLC served on 5/13/22, answer due 6/3/22. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/17/2022) Modified on 5/18/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COMPLAINT UNDER L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint byGoogle LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#14

(#14) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint byGoogle LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COMPLAINT UNDER L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Google LLC. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED .[err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re : #11 Certificate of Service filed by Steven Newman. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Steven Newman . Google, LLC served on 5/13/22, answer due 6/3/22. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/17/2022) Modified on 5/18/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#8) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2022) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Newman.. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/12/2022) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2022) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2022 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2022 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2022) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/25/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17167215.). Filed bySteven Newman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Lee Johnsrud