This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 09:01:55 (UTC).

Newby et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Newby filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Michael P. Mills. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anitra Newby

Willie Newby

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elaine Sheng

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

One Commerce Square, Suite 2600

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS MARBLE & HURST, PLLC

P. O. Box 131

Jackson, MS 39205-0131

Dorissa S. Smith

Attorney at WELLS MARBLE & HURST, PLLC

300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admission and Interrogatories by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Willie Newby. (Louis, Thomas)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admission and Interrogatories by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Anitra Newby. (Louis, Thomas)

#23

(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Conference held on 10/29/2020. (irw)

22 #4

Exhibit D - Anitra Newby - Medical Bill

22 #3

Exhibit C - Anitra Newby - Medical Record

22 #2

Exhibit B - Anitra Newby - PeopleMap - Utility Records

22 #1

Exhibit A - Anitra Newby - Voter Registration

#22

(#22) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anitra Newby - Voter Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Anitra Newby - PeopleMap - Utility Records, #3 Exhibit C - Anitra Newby - Medical Record, #4 Exhibit D - Anitra Newby - Medical Bill, #5 Errata E - Willie Newby - PeopleMap - Utility Records, #6 Exhibit F = Willie Newby - Bankruptcy - Petition, #7 Exhibit G - Willie Newby - Bankruptcy - Order) (Smith, Dorissa)

#20

(#20) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/23/20. (ncb)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended Complaint) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Louis, Thomas)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE STATEMENT. (jla)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT (AMENDED) against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Anitra Newby, Willie Newby. (jla)

1 #5

Exhibit Summons on Walmart

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Papers Served on Walmart

1 #2

Exhibit B - Amended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Original Complaint

#1

(#17) AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Supplemental Notice of Removal). (Smith, Dorissa)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admission and Interrogatories by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Willie Newby. (Louis, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admission and Interrogatories by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Anitra Newby. (Louis, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TEXT ONLY ORDER STAYING obligation to respond to Show Cause Order #20 until the earlier of service of plaintiffs' responses to discovery concerning domicile/citizenship or 12/1/20. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/29/20. (ncb) (no document attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Conference held on 10/29/2020. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anitra Newby - Voter Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Anitra Newby - PeopleMap - Utility Records, #3 Exhibit C - Anitra Newby - Medical Record, #4 Exhibit D - Anitra Newby - Medical Bill, #5 Errata E - Willie Newby - PeopleMap - Utility Records, #6 Exhibit F = Willie Newby - Bankruptcy - Petition, #7 Exhibit G - Willie Newby - Bankruptcy - Order) (Smith, Dorissa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Dial-in information provided on the notice. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/23/20. (ncb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Willie Newby. (Louis, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff Anitra Newby. (Louis, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Supplemental Notice of Removal). (Smith, Dorissa)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Dorissa S. Smith on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Smith, Dorissa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket report, #2 State Court Complaint Complaint for Damages, #3 State Court Complaint Amended Complaint for Damages, #4 Summons Summons with return on Walmart, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Smith, Dorissa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Wal-Mart is granted an extension until October 2, 2020, to file the state court record for this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/21/20. (ncb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File State Court Record by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Clerk) (Smith, Dorissa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/4/2020. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended Complaint) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Louis, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE STATEMENT. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT (AMENDED) against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Anitra Newby, Willie Newby. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Desoto County Circuit Court, case number CI2020-169CWD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1847819) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Papers Served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) #5 Exhibit Summons on Walmart) (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elaine Sheng