This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/30/2022 at 07:12:48 (UTC).

Newbery et al v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Newbery filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05325

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jorge Newbery

Holly Ringling

Defendant

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D Flick

Attorney at DannLaw

15000 Madison Avenue

Lakewood, OH 44107

Marc Edward Dann

Attorney at Dann Law Firm

15000 Madison Avenue

Lakewood, OH 44107

Sharon Harris

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 W. Washington St., Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 West Washington Street, Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19888507.(Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Sharon Harris (Harris, Sharon) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Brian D Flick (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Marc Edward Dann (Dann, Marc) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 12/2/2022 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 11/23/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. by Julie B. Porter (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #11 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to 12/27/2022. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Decision on Motion for Transfer and Consolidation Under 28 USC 1407 (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: By agreement #13 , this case is stayed pending the JPML's resolution of the pending Section 1407 motion. The initial status hearing set for 12/2/2022 #7 is stricken and re-set for 1/31/2023 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 1/24/2023. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: By agreement #13 , this case is stayed pending the JPML's resolution of the pending Section 1407 motion. The initial status hearing set for 12/2/2022 #7 is stricken and re-set for 1/31/2023 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 1/24/2023. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Decision on Motion for Transfer and Consolidation Under 28 USC 1407 (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #11 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to 12/27/2022. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. by Julie B. Porter (Porter, Julie) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 12/2/2022 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 11/23/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Marc Edward Dann (Dann, Marc) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Brian D Flick (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (smb, ) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, ) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Sharon Harris (Harris, Sharon) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jorge Newbery, Holly Ringling; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19888507.(Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharon Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc E. Dann