This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:22:38 (UTC).

Newberry-Thompson v. Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Newberry-Thompson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gershwin A. Drain and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13407

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gershwin A. Drain

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlotte Newberry-Thompson

Defendant

Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew S. Broderick

30685 Barrington, Suite 130

Madison Heights, MI 48071

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Chichester

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

200 Renaissance Center, Suite 3110

Detroit, MI 48243-1301

Jaclyn R. Giffen

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

200 Renaissance Center, Suite 3110

Detroit, MI 48243

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference re #5 Notice to Appear (TMcg) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/10/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/10/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Jury Trial set for 1/21/2021 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Refer to image for additional dates) (TMcg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jaclyn R. Giffen appearing on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-010126-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7491482 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/10/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/10/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Jury Trial set for 1/21/2021 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Refer to image for additional dates) (TMcg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2020 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TMcg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 1/13/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jaclyn R. Giffen appearing on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference re #5 Notice to Appear (TMcg) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC., ( Response due by 12/9/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-010126-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7491482 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Chichester, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.