This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 11:08:23 (UTC).

Newberne v. Sunset Solutions Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Newberne filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Sunset Solutions Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00822

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Newberne

Defendants

Marion Franklin McIlwain

Blue Circle Asset Management LLC

Marion Franklin McIlwain, Jr.

Retrievable Asset Solutions LLC

Sean Dion McIlwain

S & J Acquisitions LLC

Capital Asset Holdings Firm, LLC

Sunset Solutions Group, LLC

Stacey Larmingo Benjamin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip C. Rogers

6140 28Th St. Se, Ste. 115

Grand Rapids, MI 49546-6938

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents to be submitted by 11/12/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; S & J Acquisitions LLC served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed; Stacey Larmingo Benjamin served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Blue Circle Asset Management LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020; Marion Franklin McIlwain served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020; Retrievable Asset Solutions LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020; Sunset Solutions Group, LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Sean Dion McIlwain served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 20-CA-060 that this case is reassigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (mlc) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Stacey Larmingo Benjamin, Blue Circle Asset Management LLC, Capital Asset Holdings Firm, LLC, Marion Franklin McIlwain, Sean Dion McIlwain, Retrievable Asset Solutions LLC, S & J Acquisitions LLC, Sunset Solutions Group, LLC (mg) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ndj) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Berens indicating that this case not related (ndj) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Donald Newberne in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5621463 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Newberne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip C. Rogers