This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 19:19:08 (UTC).

NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP et al v. THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed an Other lawsuit against THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12306

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC D/B/A AT&T MOBILITY

T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC

NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS

NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as VERIZON WIRELESS

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC doing business as AT&T MOBILITY

Defendants

ZONING BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT OF THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY

THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT D. GAUDIOSO

Attorney at SNYDER & SNYDER, LLP

94 White Plains Rd

White Plains, NY 10591

GREGORY D MEESE

Attorney at PRICE, MEESE, SHULMAN & D'ARMINIO PC

50 Tice Boulevard

Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07675

KENNETH J. WILBUR

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

ANDREW B. JOSEPH

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Defendant Attorney

MARC D'ANGIOLILLO

Attorney at RIKER DANZIG

One Speedwell Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07962

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on October 14, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/6/2021. (sms) (Entered: 09/06/2021)

#13

(#13) Defendants the Township of Cranford, New Jersey and the Zoning Board of Adjustment of the Township of Cranford, New Jersey's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants' deadline to respond to the amended complaint shall be extended to August 30, 2021. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/16/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION and Proposed Order by All Defendants. (D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; ZONING BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT OF THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH J. WILBUR on behalf of NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC (WILBUR, KENNETH) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW B. JOSEPH on behalf of NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC (JOSEPH, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY, ZONING BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT OF THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint

#6

(#6) Exhibit to #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint)(MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT D. GAUDIOSO on behalf of T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC (GAUDIOSO, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC D/B/A AT&T MOBILITY identifying AT&T INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC identifying T-MOBILE USA, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS identifying CELLCO PARTNERSHIP as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12532386), filed by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on October 14, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/6/2021. (sms) (Entered: 09/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendants the Township of Cranford, New Jersey and the Zoning Board of Adjustment of the Township of Cranford, New Jersey's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants' deadline to respond to the amended complaint shall be extended to August 30, 2021. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/16/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION and Proposed Order by All Defendants. (D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; ZONING BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT OF THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH J. WILBUR on behalf of NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC (WILBUR, KENNETH) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW B. JOSEPH on behalf of NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC (JOSEPH, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY, ZONING BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT OF THE TOWNSHIP OF CRANFORD, NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Exhibit to #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint)(MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT D. GAUDIOSO on behalf of T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC (GAUDIOSO, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC D/B/A AT&T MOBILITY identifying AT&T INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC identifying T-MOBILE USA, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS identifying CELLCO PARTNERSHIP as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12532386), filed by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile Northeast LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS doing business as Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant