This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 07:48:05 (UTC).

NEW SOUTH MEDIA GROUP LLC v. CITY OF QUINCY FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 NEW SOUTH MEDIA GROUP LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF QUINCY FLORIDA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L HINKLE and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

New South Media Group, LLC

NEW SOUTH MEDIA GROUP LLC

Defendant

CITY OF QUINCY FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANNY PHILLIPS

Attorney at PHILLIPS LAW FIRM - TALLAHASSEE FL

1115 N Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32303

E ADAM WEBB

Attorney at WEBB KLASE & LEMOND LLC

1900 The Exchange Se, Ste 480

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

GARY ANTHONY ROBERTS

Attorney at GARY A ROBERTS & ASSOC LLC - TALLAHASSEE FL

130 Salem Ct

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2809

MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL

Attorney at HOLTZMAN VOGEL BARAN ET AL - TALLAHASSEE FL

5817 Dahlgren Trail

Tallahassee, FL 32312

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NEW SOUTH MEDIA GROUP LLC. (PHILLIPS, DANNY) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - As required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and paragraph 7 of the initial scheduling order entered May 14, 2021, the plaintiff must promptly file its corporate disclosure statements. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/3/2021. (cle) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed re: #6 Initial Scheduling Order. The deadline to file Corporate Disclosure Statement has expired. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. (cle) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of CITY OF QUINCY FLORIDA (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT - re: #5 Stipulation. The parties' stipulation, ECF No. #5 , is deemed a motion to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint. The motion is granted. The deadline is extended to 7/14/2021. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/14/2021. (cle) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/28/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2021. Discovery due by 1/20/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/14/2021. (cle) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint. This case is ready for an ISO to be issued. (cle) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION Extending Answer/Response Date by NEW SOUTH MEDIA GROUP LLC. (PHILLIPS, DANNY) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to CITY OF QUINCY FLORIDA. (cle) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE summons to be issued by clerk by New South Media Group, LLC (PHILLIPS, DANNY) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PHILLIPS, DANNY) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF QUINCY FLORIDA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6038297.), filed by New South Media Group, LLC. (PHILLIPS, DANNY) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. Adam Webb