This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2020 at 10:52:05 (UTC).

New Prime Inc v. AEDS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 New Prime Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AEDS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00469

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New Prime Inc

Defendants

AEDS, LLC

James S. Augustus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael P. Kenney

Attorney at Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP - HRTFD

Cityplace Ii, 185 Asylum St., 6Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Defendant Attorneys

Cassandra Lynn Sanchez

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

185 Asylum Street, Suite 3701

Hartford, CT 06103

Angeline Nicole Ioannou

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

185 Asylum Street, 37Th Floor, Suite 3701

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/13/2020 responsive pleading to complaint #1 Complaint by AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus. (Sanchez, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Lynn Sanchez on behalf of AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus (Sanchez, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Angeline Nicole Ioannou on behalf of AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus (Ioannou, Angeline) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Prime Inc. AEDS, LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020; James S. Augustus served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Prime Inc. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James S. Augustus* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael P. Kenney* *Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP - HRTFD* *CityPlace II, 185 Asylum St., 6th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *AEDS, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael P. Kenney* *Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP - HRTFD* *CityPlace II, 185 Asylum St., 6th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by New Prime Inc Signed by Clerk on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 10/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5787255.), filed by New Prime, Inc..(Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for AEDS, LLC to 6/13/2020; James S. Augustus to 6/13/2020. Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/29/2020. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time until June 13, 2020 for Defendants to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/14/2020. (Conde, Djenab) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/13/2020 responsive pleading to complaint #1 Complaint by AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus. (Sanchez, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Lynn Sanchez on behalf of AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus (Sanchez, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Angeline Nicole Ioannou on behalf of AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus (Ioannou, Angeline) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Prime Inc. AEDS, LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020; James S. Augustus served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Prime Inc. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James S. Augustus* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael P. Kenney* *Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP - HRTFD* *CityPlace II, 185 Asylum St., 6th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *AEDS, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael P. Kenney* *Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP - HRTFD* *CityPlace II, 185 Asylum St., 6th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by New Prime Inc Signed by Clerk on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 10/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketJudge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to James S. Augustus. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to AEDS, LLC. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5787255.), filed by New Prime, Inc..(Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less