This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2019 at 07:06:37 (UTC).

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION et al v. E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel Schneider and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-14765

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE NEW JERSEY SPILL COMPENSATION FUND

THE COMMISSIONER OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

Defendants

E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY

THE CHEMOURS COMPANY

THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GWEN FARLEY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

25 Market Street, P.O. Box 093

Trenton, NJ 08625

LEONARD Z. KAUFMANN

Attorney at COHN, LIFLAND, PEARLMAN, HERRMANN & KNOPF, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, Po Box 652

Newark, NJ 07101-0652

RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL

Attorney at CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC

One Boland Drive

West Orange, NJ 07052

ALISON MORRISSEY

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH

1600 Market Street, Suite 3900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

JOHN J. MCALEESE, III

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

1600 Market Street, Suite 3900

Philadelphia, PA 19085

NATHAN C. HOWE

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

JEFFREY SCOTT CHIESA

Attorney at CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC

One Boland Drive

West Orange, NJ 07052

MARTHA N. DONOVAN

Attorney at NORRIS, MCLAUGHLIN & MARCUS, PA

400 Crossing Boulevard, 8Th Fl, Po Box 5933

Bridgewater, NJ 08807

MARGARET M. RAYMOND-FLOOD

Attorney at NORRIS MCLAUGHLIN, P.A.

400 Crossing Boulevard, 8Th Floor, Po Box 5933

Bridgewater, NJ 08807

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#19

#18

#16

#15

#14

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER Staying all discovery and proceedings in these matters until further Order of the Court; All Motions to Remand in these cases shall be filed by September 20, 2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/27/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. MCALEESE, III on behalf of E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (MCALEESE, JOHN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Letter from attorneys for Plaintiffs to Magistrate Judges Mannion, Schneider and Quraishi. (KAUFMANN, LEONARD) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER -- The Court finding good cause to enter this Order, it is hereby ORDERED the deadline for all defendants to respond to plaintiffs' complaint is STAYED pending further Order of the Court. This Order does not apply to any Motions to Remand that may be filed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/26/19. (Schneider, Joel) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL on behalf of E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY (ISRAEL, RONALD) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY SCOTT CHIESA on behalf of E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY (CHIESA, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER -- As to C.A. Nos. 19-14765(NLH) and 19-14766(RMB), it is hereby ORDERED the initial conferences scheduled before this Court on August 21, 2019 are POSTPONED. It is further ORDERED the due date for the parties' letter(s) regarding the "proposed approach for case management going forward" of the four (4) related pending NJDEP v. Dupont cases is August 23, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/12/19. (Schneider, Joel) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certification of Leonard Z. Kaufman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (KAUFMANN, LEONARD) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN C. HOWE on behalf of E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (HOWE, NATHAN) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE on behalf of E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (DUMVILLE, AMANDA) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET M. RAYMOND-FLOOD on behalf of THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (RAYMOND-FLOOD, MARGARET) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MARTHA N. DONOVAN on behalf of THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (DONOVAN, MARTHA) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 8/21/2019 02:30 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/8/19. (ssp, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY of Filing of Notice of Removal in NJ Superior Court, Gloucester County (KURZWEIL, LANNY) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY from Superior Court of Gloucester County, NJ, case number L-000388-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9792723), filed by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE NEW JERSEY SPILL COMPENSATION FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION is a litigant

Latest cases where E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Co. is a litigant