This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2023 at 09:29:36 (UTC).

New Era Cap, LLC v. Twnty-Two, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 New Era Cap, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Twnty-Two, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John L. Sinatra, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New Era Cap, LLC

Defendants

TWNTY-TWO, INC.

GARY GONZALEZ

DATWON THOMAS

SADE ROGERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Berchou

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons (TWNTY-TWO, INC.)

1 #2

Summons (GONZALEZ)

1 #3

Summons (THOMAS)

1 #4

Summons (ROGERS)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW ERA CAP LLC identifying Corporate Parent New Era Cap Global, LLC for NEW ERA CAP LLC.. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2023)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Gary Gonzalez, Sade Rogers, Datwon Thomas, Twnty-Two, Inc. (TMK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Era Cap, LLC. Gary Gonzalez served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Era Cap, LLC. Twnty-Two, Inc. served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Era Cap, LLC. Twnty-Two, Inc. served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Era Cap, LLC. Gary Gonzalez served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Gary Gonzalez, Sade Rogers, Datwon Thomas, Twnty-Two, Inc. (TMK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (TMK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW ERA CAP LLC identifying Corporate Parent New Era Cap Global, LLC for NEW ERA CAP LLC.. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GARY GONZALEZ, SADE ROGERS, DATWON THOMAS, TWNTY-TWO, INC. $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4763129, filed by NEW ERA CAP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons (TWNTY-TWO, INC.), #2 Summons (GONZALEZ), #3 Summons (THOMAS), #4 Summons (ROGERS), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less