This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:39:43 (UTC).

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. City of Miami

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City of Miami. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24939

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC

600 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant

City of Miami

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Brandon Green

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.

Brickell World Plaza, Suite 3500, 600 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

George S. LeMieux

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart

450 E Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Henry Joseph Hunnefeld

Attorney at Miami City Attorney's Office

444 Sw 2Nd Avenue, Suite 945

Miami, FL 33130-1910

Eric John Eves

Attorney at City of Miami

444 S.W. 2Nd Avenue, Suite 945

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#1

(#8) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es), #1 Complaint filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) Initial Disclosure(s) of Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit 1

5 #6

Exhibit 6

5 #3

Exhibit 3

#9

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Miami. Attorney Henry Joseph Hunnefeld added to party City of Miami(pty:dft). Replies due by 12/13/2019. (Hunnefeld, Henry) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Denied as Moot: #9 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

9 #7

Exhibit 7

9 #6

Exhibit 6

9 #5

Exhibit 5

9 #4

Exhibit 4

9 #2

Exhibit 2

9 #3

Exhibit 3

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Denied as Moot: #9 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF 20) by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due 12/23/19. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (rrt) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER resetting hearing on #9 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction . **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/10/2019. (rrt) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue hearing on Plaintiff's #9 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/10/2019. (rrt) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Agreed MOTION to Continue re #11 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (rrt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric John Eves on behalf of City of Miami. Attorney Eric John Eves added to party City of Miami(pty:dft). (Eves, Eric) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Miami. Attorney Henry Joseph Hunnefeld added to party City of Miami(pty:dft). Replies due by 12/13/2019. (Hunnefeld, Henry) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to City of Miami. (cqs) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Renewed EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es), #1 Complaint filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters And Order Regarding Court Practices And Procedures. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Expedited Motion for preliminary injunction for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1(d)(2), which states an Expedited Motion "must set forth in detail the date by which an expedited ruling is needed and the reason the ruling is needed by the stated date." Plaintiff may renew its motion in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/2/2019. (rrt) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION Enjoining the City from (1) enforcing the Moratorium Against AT&T and (ii) mandating the City issue a letter to all necessary authorities and permitting entities allowing AT&T to install approved facilities by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Disclosure(s) of Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Green, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (cds) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against City of Miami. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12187002, filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(Green, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.