This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2020 at 08:39:58 (UTC).

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. City of Commerce

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City of Commerce. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09984

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dean D. Pregerson

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

City of Commerce

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew Zachary Edelstein

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Raymond Paul Bolanos

Attorney at AT and T Services Inc Legal Dept

430 Bush Street 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The summons was filed in the incorrect case. The summons should be filed in case 2:19-cv-10852 DDP (KSx).. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#18

(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Commerce. (shb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24827869 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attorney Raymond Paul Bolanos added to party New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb) Modified on 12/30/2019 (shb). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#15

(#15) [DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DKT #15 SEE NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, DKT #17 . MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb) Modified on 12/30/2019 (shb). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #15 . This docket entry is a duplicate of docket entry #14 . (shb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein counsel for Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Adding Andrew Z. Edelstein as counsel of record for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein added to party New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC(pty:pla))(Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-9984 DDP (KSx). (esa) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Commerce. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, identifying AT&T Mobility II, LLC; Bell Mobile Data; AT&T Corp.; AT&T Mobility LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

2 #2

Notice of Interested Parties

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 11/21/2019, receipt number 26LM2QAR), filed by plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.(Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

2 #1

Summons

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The summons was filed in the incorrect case. The summons should be filed in case 2:19-cv-10852 DDP (KSx).. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Commerce. (shb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #15 . This docket entry is a duplicate of docket entry #14 . (shb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) [DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DKT #15 SEE NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, DKT #17 . MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb) Modified on 12/30/2019 (shb). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb) Modified on 12/30/2019 (shb). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein counsel for Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Adding Andrew Z. Edelstein as counsel of record for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein added to party New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC(pty:pla))(Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-9984 DDP (KSx). (esa) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Commerce. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, identifying AT&T Mobility II, LLC; Bell Mobile Data; AT&T Corp.; AT&T Mobility LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Withdrawal of Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 , MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 filed by Plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORRECTED Notice of Interested Parties with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 11/21/2019, receipt number 26LM2QAR), filed by plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.(Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 11/21/2019, receipt number 26LM2QAR), filed by plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.(Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 11/21/2019, receipt number 26LM2QAR), filed by plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24827869 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attorney Raymond Paul Bolanos added to party New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.