This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2022 at 10:06:42 (UTC).

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. Lane County, Oregon

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Lane County, Oregon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01635

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mustafa T. Kasubhai

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility

Defendant

Lane County, Oregon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hans J. Germann

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 S. Wacker Dr.

Chicago, IL 60606

Raymond Bolanos

Attorney at AT&T Legal Dept.

430 Bush St, Ste 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Robert Double

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, 47Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

Sebastian Tapia

Attorney at Lane County Counsel

125 East 8Th Avenue

Eugene, OR 97401

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Notice of Change of Address. Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#19

(#19) Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#18

(#18) Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jw) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#17

(#17) Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Lane County, Oregon. (Tapia, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#11

(#12) Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8712833. The request has been granted and the amount of $300.00 will be refunded to Nicholas von Dinger Related Doc #11 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (nd) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#7

Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Hans J. Germann. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8712833 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed as to Lane County, Oregon served on 10/27/2022, answer due on 11/17/2022. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Case Management Order signed on 10/26/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Lane County, Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/23/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/27/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 3/27/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, D/B/A AT&T Mobility. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Lane County, Oregon. (Tapia, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • Docket(#21) MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference by telephone. Discovery is to be completed by 4/1/2023. Dispositive Motions are due by 6/1/2023. The Court will set further deadlines in this action following its ruling on the parties' anticipated motions for summary judgment, if necessary. Hans Germann present as counsel for plaintiff. Sebastian Tapia present as counsel for defendant. Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai presiding. (FTR - Eugene Courtroom 3) (jk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Change of Address. Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jw) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#14) Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 12/13/2022 at 10:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by e-mail the day before the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the Court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. All deadlines are VACATED and will be reset at the Rule 16 Conference. Pronoun Usage: The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their pronouns and honorifics (such as Ms., Mx., or Mr.). People appearing before this Court may provide their pronouns and honorifics in writing or orally when appearing for conferences, hearings, or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their pronouns and honorifics in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. Parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those previously identified pronouns and honorifics. (jk) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Lane County, Oregon. (Tapia, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8712833. The request has been granted and the amount of $300.00 will be refunded to Nicholas von Dinger Related Doc #11 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (nd) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Raymond Bolanos. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8713177 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Raymond Bolanos. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8713177. Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Bolanos, Raymond) (Entered: 11/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Hans J. Germann. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8712833 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Hans J. Germann. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8712833. Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Germann, Hans) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed as to Lane County, Oregon served on 10/27/2022, answer due on 11/17/2022. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Management Order signed on 10/26/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Lane County, Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/23/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/27/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 3/27/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, D/B/A AT&T Mobility. (Double, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8700644 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, D/B/A AT&T Mobility against Lane County, Oregon (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Double, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANE, COUNTY OF/OREGON, STATE OF is a litigant

Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hans Joseph Germann