This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2021 at 06:59:47 (UTC).

New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC v. City Of Oakland

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City Of Oakland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06486

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility

New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility

Defendant

City Of Oakland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elspeth Victoria Hansen

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

Two Palo Alto Square, Suite 300, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Hans Joseph Germann

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Raymond Paul Bolanos

Attorney at AT&T Services, Inc. Legal Dept.

430 Bush Street, 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

David Alejandro Pereda

Attorney at Office of The Oakland City Attorney

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Cynthia F Stein

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney's Office

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, Sixth Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Cynthia F. Stein

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney's Office

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#25

#24

#23

#22

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/1/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket(#26) CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Conference Statement due 3/5/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 has been continued to 3/12/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https: //www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry ge nerated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - FIFTH JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. (Germann, Hans) (Filed on 1/15/2021) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting (44) Motion to Stay; denying (45) Motion to Shorten Time and vacating January 8, 2021 hearing on Motion to Stay. The three related cases are stayed through January 22, 2021. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference for 20-cv-1499 and 20-2382 and Initial Case Management Conference for 20-6486 held on 10/16/2020. Upon the filing of the amended complaint, the Court will consolidate these cases. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/29/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2021. Designation of Experts due by 2/22/2021. Rebuttal Reports due by 3/8/2021. Bench Trial set for 9/7/2021 through 9/13/2021 08:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2021 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscou rts.gov/zoom/. FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Hans Germann, Ray Bolanos. Defendant Attorney: David Pereda, Cynthia Stein. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) **PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY****Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) Modified on 10/15/2020 (haS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#21) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Given the short notice the parties do not need to file a case management conference statement. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Gene ral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 02:00 PM by Videoconference On ly. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER RELATING CASE. Related cases: Create association to 3:20-cv-01499-JCS.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/14/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Hans Joseph Germann's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Hans Germann (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14974043.) filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Germann, Hans) (Filed on 9/22/2020) Modified on 9/23/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to City Of Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Paul Bolanos for Plaintiff AT&T Mobility (Bolanos, Raymond) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elspeth Victoria Hansen for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, d/b/a AT&T Mobility (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Other Affiliate New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Other Affiliate SBC Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate AT&T Mobility LLC, Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Other Affiliate SBC Tower Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility for New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory And Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Review Pursuant to 47 U.S.C. 332(c)(7)(B)(v) against City Of Oakland ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14947996.). Filed byNew Cingular Wireless PCS LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Alejandro Pereda