This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:29:41 (UTC).

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. City Of Oakland

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City Of Oakland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02382

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility

Defendant

City Of Oakland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elspeth Victoria Hansen

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

Two Palo Alto Square, Suite 300, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Hans Joseph Germann

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Raymond Paul Bolanos

Attorney at AT&T Services, Inc. Legal Dept.

430 Bush Street, 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

David Alejandro Pereda

Attorney at Office of The Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Cynthia F Stein

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney's Office

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, Sixth Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

9 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#24) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Wednesday, June 3, 2020 at 3:00 PM PDT.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/86278464175?pwd=MGdNbjVzNkFiRmdDVXBQV0p3c2E1Zz09Meeting ID: 862 7846 4175Password: 018306Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photogr aphing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Germann, Hans) (Filed on 5/29/2020) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stein, Cynthia) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Germann, Hans) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint Defendant City of Oakland's Answer to AT&T's Complaint byCity Of Oakland. (Stein, Cynthia) (Filed on 5/1/2020) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of Oakland.. (Stein, Cynthia) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by David Alejandro Pereda for Defendant City of Oakland (Pereda, David) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia F Stein For Defendant City of Oakland (Stein, Cynthia) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC to Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Paul Bolanos for Plaintiff AT&T Mobility (Bolanos, Raymond) (Filed on 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. City Of Oakland served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to City Of Oakland. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hans Germann ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14358732.) filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility. (Germann, Hans) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elspeth Victoria Hansen for Plaintiff AT&T Mobility (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility identifying Corporate Parent New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Tower Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate AT&T Inc for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Review Pursuant to 47 U.S.C. 332(c)(7)(B)(v) against City Of Oakland (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14355458). Filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC dba AT&T Mobility. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Alejandro Pereda