This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:23:08 (UTC).

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01499

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility

Defendant

City Of Oakland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elspeth Victoria Hansen

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

Two Palo Alto Square, Suite 300, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Hans Joseph Germann

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Raymond Paul Bolanos

Attorney at AT&T Services, Inc. Legal Dept.

430 Bush Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

David Alejandro Pereda

Attorney at Office of The Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Cynthia F Stein

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney's Office

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, Sixth Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

24 #3

Proposed Order

24 #2

Stipulation In Support

24 #1

Exhibit A

#24

#23

#22

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to Complaint Defendant City of Oakland's Answer to AT&T's Complaint byCity Of Oakland. (Stein, Cynthia) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Order, signed 4/21/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Germann.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER RELATING CASE. Related cases: Create association to 3:20-cv-02382-JSC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AT&T's Unopposed Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Responses due by 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Stipulation In Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of Oakland.. (Stein, Cynthia) (Filed on 3/26/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING re #18 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by City Of Oakland. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/18/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by David Alejandro Pereda (Pereda, David) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION to extend time to respond to Complaint filed by City Of Oakland. (Stein, Cynthia) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/05/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. City Of Oakland served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 3/5/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to City Of Oakland. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Hans Germann ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14231116.) filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Germann, Hans) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elspeth Victoria Hansen for Plaintiff AT&T Mobility (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Corporate Parent New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Mobility LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Tower Holdings LLC for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Review Pursuant to 14 U.S.C. 332(C)(7)(B)(v) against City Of Oakland. Filed byNew Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Payment made. Receipt number: 0971-14229953) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 2/28/2020) Modified on 2/28/2020 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Alejandro Pereda

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cynthia F Stein