This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 07:01:53 (UTC).

Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Tesoro Refining Marketing Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03773

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Marathon Petroleum Company LP

Marathon Petroleum Corporation

Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Marc Robert Lewis

Attorney at Lewis & Llewellyn

71 Stevenson St., Suite 825

San Francisco, CA 94105

Rebecca Furman

Attorney at Lewis & Llewellyn LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Scott Thomas Tropio

Attorney at Tropio & Morlan

21700 Oxnard St., Ste. 1700

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP's ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership byMarathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND BY 30 DAYS (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Furman on Behalf of Plaintiff Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership (Furman, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership.. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 5

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. All Defendants. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC.. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership identifying Other Affiliate Hossain Khaziri, Other Affiliate Christine Khaziri, Other Affiliate C.H.W.D. Inc., Other Affiliate FirstElement Fuel Inc. for Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13477256.). Filed byNevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC.. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP's ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership byMarathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND BY 30 DAYS (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. All Defendants. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Furman on Behalf of Plaintiff Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership (Furman, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership.. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership identifying Other Affiliate Hossain Khaziri, Other Affiliate Christine Khaziri, Other Affiliate C.H.W.D. Inc., Other Affiliate FirstElement Fuel Inc. for Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13477256.). Filed byNevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.